EP2889760 - SMS4 acceleration processors, methods, systems, and instructions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2020/13] |
Former [2015/27] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolrich, Gilbert M. 1 Macomber Lane Framingham, MA 01702 / US | 02 /
Gopal, Vinodh 15 West End Avenue Westborough, MA 01581 / US | 03 /
Yap, Kirk S. 224 Belknap Rd. Framingham, MA 01701 / US | 04 /
Feghali, Wajdi K. 199 Massachusetts Avenue, 206 Boston, MA 02115 / US | [2015/27] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/13] | HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2015/27] | Jennings, Vincent Louis HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 14194114.6 | 20.11.2014 | [2015/27] | Priority number, date | US201314142724 | 27.12.2013 Original published format: US201314142724 | [2015/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2889760 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2889760 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2889760 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/30, G06F9/38, H04L9/06, G06F21/60 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
G06F9/30032 (EP,US);
G06F9/30145 (US);
G06F21/602 (EP,US);
G06F9/30007 (EP);
G06F9/30036 (EP,US);
G06F9/3895 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/27] | G06F9/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] | Title | German: | SMS4-Beschleunigungsprozessoren, Verfahren, Systeme und Anweisungen | [2015/27] | English: | SMS4 acceleration processors, methods, systems, and instructions | [2015/27] | French: | Processeurs, procédés, systèmes et instructions d'accélération SMS4 | [2015/27] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 23.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 23.07.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 23.07.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.08.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 23.07.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 23.07.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.08.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2014 | AL | 25.03.2020 | AT | 25.03.2020 | CY | 25.03.2020 | CZ | 25.03.2020 | DK | 25.03.2020 | EE | 25.03.2020 | ES | 25.03.2020 | FI | 25.03.2020 | HR | 25.03.2020 | IT | 25.03.2020 | LT | 25.03.2020 | LV | 25.03.2020 | MC | 25.03.2020 | MK | 25.03.2020 | MT | 25.03.2020 | PL | 25.03.2020 | RO | 25.03.2020 | RS | 25.03.2020 | SE | 25.03.2020 | SI | 25.03.2020 | SK | 25.03.2020 | SM | 25.03.2020 | TR | 25.03.2020 | BG | 25.06.2020 | NO | 25.06.2020 | GR | 26.06.2020 | IS | 25.07.2020 | PT | 18.08.2020 | IE | 20.11.2020 | LU | 20.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/31] | HU | 20.11.2014 | |
AL | 25.03.2020 | ||
AT | 25.03.2020 | ||
CY | 25.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
MK | 25.03.2020 | ||
MT | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
TR | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
IE | 20.11.2020 | ||
LU | 20.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/30] | HU | 20.11.2014 | |
AL | 25.03.2020 | ||
AT | 25.03.2020 | ||
CY | 25.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
MT | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
TR | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
IE | 20.11.2020 | ||
LU | 20.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.11.2014 | |
AT | 25.03.2020 | ||
CY | 25.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
MT | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
TR | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
IE | 20.11.2020 | ||
LU | 20.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
IE | 20.11.2020 | ||
LU | 20.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
LU | 20.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
LU | 20.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
NO | 25.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008240426 (GUERON SHAY [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2096787 (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101764685 (GCI SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101764684 (GCI SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011087895 (OLSON CHRISTOPHER H [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X] - ZHENZHOU LI ET AL, "The Research and Application of a Specific Instruction Processor for SMS4", TRUST, SECURITY AND PRIVACY IN COMPUTING AND COMMUNICATIONS (TRUSTCOM), 2012 IEEE 11TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20120625), doi:10.1109/TRUSTCOM.2012.275, ISBN 978-1-4673-2172-3, pages 1883 - 1888, XP032233656 [X] 1,9,14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TrustCom.2012.275 | [X] - ZHENZHOU LI ET AL, "The Research and Application of a Specific Instruction Processor for SMS4", 2012 IEEE 11TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TRUST, SECURITY AND PRIVACY IN COMPUTING AND COMMUNICATIONS, (20120601), doi:10.1109/TrustCom.2012.275, ISBN 978-0-7695-4745-9, pages 1883 - 1888, XP055433724 [X] 1,9,14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TrustCom.2012.275 | [I] - LIN HAN ET AL, "A programmable security processor for cryptography algorithms", SOLID-STATE AND INTEGRATED-CIRCUIT TECHNOLOGY, 2008. ICSICT 2008. 9TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, Piscataway, NJ, USA, (20080101), doi:10.1109/ICSICT.2008.4734992, ISBN 978-1-4244-2185-5, pages 2144 - 2147, XP055433754 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSICT.2008.4734992 | [ ] - LIN HAN ET AL, "A programmable security processor for cryptography algorithms", SOLID-STATE AND INTEGRATED-CIRCUIT TECHNOLOGY, 2008. ICSICT 2008. 9TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081020), doi:10.1109/ICSICT.2008.4734992, ISBN 978-1-4244-2185-5, pages 2144 - 2147, XP031384711 [ ] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSICT.2008.4734992 |