EP2881164 - Semi-permeable membranes and production methods thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | For all designated states Dong-Eui University Industry-Academic Cooperation Foundation Gaya-dong 176, Umkwang-ro Busanjin-gu, Busan / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | ||
For all designated states Dong-Eui University Industry-Academic Cooperation Foundation Gaya-dong 176, Umkwang-ro Busanjin-gu, Busan / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Han, Sung Soo 880-402 Dongtansubsok-ro 68 Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, No Won 955, Eumgwang-ro Gaya 3-dong Busanjin-gu Busan-si / KR | 03 /
Jung, Bo Ram 955, Eumgwang-ro Gaya 3-dong Busanjin-gu Busan-si / KR | 04 /
Kwon, Bok Soon 201, Towervill Eonnam 1-gil 16-10 Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | Zijlstra, Robert Wiebo Johan Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2015/24] | Application number, filing date | 14194163.3 | 20.11.2014 | [2015/24] | Priority number, date | KR20130151799 | 06.12.2013 Original published format: KR 20130151799 | [2015/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2881164 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01D69/12, B01D71/56, B01D67/00, B01D69/10, B01D69/14, B01D71/02 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
B01D69/1071 (EP,KR,US);
B01D61/0022 (KR);
B01D61/025 (KR);
B01D67/00793 (EP,KR,US);
B01D67/0088 (EP,KR,US);
B01D69/105 (EP,KR,US);
B01D69/107 (KR);
B01D69/108 (KR);
B01D69/1216 (KR);
B01D69/125 (EP,KR,US);
B01D69/141 (EP,KR,US);
B01D69/148 (KR);
B01D71/022 (KR);
B01D71/024 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/025 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/027 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/0281 (KR);
B01D71/06 (US);
B01D71/12 (KR);
B01D71/16 (KR);
B01D71/54 (KR);
B01D71/56 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/64 (KR);
C02F1/441 (KR,US);
C02F1/445 (KR,US);
B01D2323/12 (KR);
B01D2323/21811 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2323/21813 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2323/219 (KR);
B01D2325/022 (KR);
B01D2325/54 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2015/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Semipermeable Membrane und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2015/24] | English: | Semi-permeable membranes and production methods thereof | [2015/24] | French: | Membranes semi-perméables et leurs procédés de production | [2015/24] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 21.01.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012261344 (KURTH CHRISTOPHER JAMES [US], et al); | [A]US2013029843 (EDMISTON PAUL L [US], et al); | [XPL]US2014158612 (KONG HYE YOUNG [KR], et al) |