EP2963949 - Method and apparatus for decoding a compressed HOA representation, and method and apparatus for encoding a compressed HOA representation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krueger, Alexander Feuerbachstrasse 16 30655 Hannover / DE | 02 /
Kordon, Sven Mühlenkampstraße 50 A 31515 Wunstorf / DE | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne, et al TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | König, Uwe, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 14194186.4 | 20.11.2014 | [2016/01] | Priority number, date | EP20140306080 | 02.07.2014 Original published format: EP 14306080 | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2963949 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04S3/00, G10L19/008 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
H04S3/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G10L19/008 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G10L19/0204 (US);
H04S3/008 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04S2420/07 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04S2420/11 (EP,CN,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Dekodierung einer komprimierten HOA-Darstellung sowie Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kodierung einer komprimierten HOA-Darstellung | [2016/01] | English: | Method and apparatus for decoding a compressed HOA representation, and method and apparatus for encoding a compressed HOA representation | [2016/01] | French: | Procédé et appareil de décodage d'une représentation de HOA comprimé et procédé et appareil permettant de coder une représentation HOA comprimé | [2016/01] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/52] | 12.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014016784 (SEN DIPANJAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [AD]EP2665208 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP2469741 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A] - "WD1-HOA Text of MPEG-H 3D Audio", 107. MPEG MEETING;13-1-2014 - 17-1-2014; SAN JOSE; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20140221), no. N14264, XP030021001 [A] 1-15 * page 60 - page 83 * | by applicant | EP2743922 | EP2665208 | EP2738962 | - JORG FLIEGE; ULRIKE MAIER, "A two-stage approach for computing cubature formulae for the sphere. Technical report", FACHBEREICH MATHEMATIK, (1999), URL: http://www.mathematik.uni-dortmund.de/Isx/research/projects/fliege/nodes/nodes.html | - DANIEL D. LEE; H. SEBASTIAN SEUNG, "Learning the parts of objects by nonnegative matrix factorization", NATURE, (1999), vol. 401, doi:doi:10.1038/44565, pages 788 - 791, XP008056832 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/44565 | - BOAZ RAFAELY, "Plane-wave decomposition of the sound field on a sphere by spherical convolution", J. ACOUST. SOC. AM., (200410), vol. 4, no. 116, pages 2149 - 2157 | - "Fourier Acoustics", EARL G. WILLIAMS, Applied Mathematical Sciences, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1999), vol. 93 | EP20130305558 |