EP3023316 - Tow bar assembly and dolly comprising the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states K. Hartwall Oy AB Kay Hartwallin tie 2 01150 Söderkulla / FI | [2016/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grönholm, Jack c/o K. Hartwall Oy Ab Kay Hartwallin tie 2 01150 Söderkulla / FI | [2017/29] |
Former [2016/21] | 01 /
Grönholm, Jack c/o K. Hartwall Oy Ab Kay Hartwallin tie 2 FI-01150 Söderkulla / FI | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2016/21] | Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 14194220.1 | 21.11.2014 | [2016/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3023316 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3023316 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B62B5/00 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
B60D1/155 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B62B5/0079 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B62D63/08 (US);
B60D2001/005 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B62B2207/00 (EP,CN,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] |
Former [2016/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Schleppstangenanordnung und Rollwagen damit | [2016/21] | English: | Tow bar assembly and dolly comprising the same | [2016/21] | French: | Chariot et ensemble de barre de remorquage comprenant celui-ci | [2016/21] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2014 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 24.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.07.2017 | AT | 19.07.2017 | CY | 19.07.2017 | DK | 19.07.2017 | EE | 19.07.2017 | FI | 19.07.2017 | HR | 19.07.2017 | LT | 19.07.2017 | LV | 19.07.2017 | MC | 19.07.2017 | MK | 19.07.2017 | NL | 19.07.2017 | PT | 19.07.2017 | RS | 19.07.2017 | SE | 19.07.2017 | SI | 19.07.2017 | SM | 19.07.2017 | BG | 19.10.2017 | NO | 19.10.2017 | GR | 20.10.2017 | IS | 19.11.2017 | IE | 21.11.2017 | LU | 21.11.2017 | MT | 21.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MK | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PT | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
IE | 21.11.2017 | ||
LU | 21.11.2017 | ||
MT | 21.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MK | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
IE | 21.11.2017 | ||
LU | 21.11.2017 | ||
MT | 21.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
IE | 21.11.2017 | ||
LU | 21.11.2017 | ||
MT | 21.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
IE | 21.11.2017 | ||
LU | 21.11.2017 | ||
MT | 21.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 21.11.2017 | ||
MT | 21.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 21.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/26] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 19.07.2017 | |
NO | 19.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2876957 (FIMOPART SA [FR]) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [A]FR2966120 (IND DE THERMOFORMAGE ET MECANO SOUDURE [FR]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2012072856 (HARTWALL K OY AB, et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2778015 (HARTWALL K OY AB [FI]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4856810 | EP2278015 |