EP2886402 - Drive mount for a drive unit, and electrical steering lock with such a drive mount [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG Steeger Strasse 17 42551 Velbert / DE | [2015/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zillmann, Horst Leienfelsstr. 25 81243 München / DE | [2015/26] | Representative(s) | Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Gutenbergstraße 39 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/26] | Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 2 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 14194275.5 | 21.11.2014 | [2015/26] | Priority number, date | DE201310114788 | 23.12.2013 Original published format: DE102013114788 | [2015/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2886402 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2886402 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/0215 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
B60R25/02153 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] |
Former [2015/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Antriebsträger für eine Antriebseinheit und elektrische Lenkverriegelung mit einem solchen Antriebsträger | [2015/26] | English: | Drive mount for a drive unit, and electrical steering lock with such a drive mount | [2015/26] | French: | Support d'entraînement pour une unité d'entraînement et verrouillage électrique de direction doté d'un tel support d'entraînement | [2016/14] |
Former [2015/26] | Support d'entrainement pour une unité d'entrainement et verrouillage électrique de direction doté d'un tel support d'entrainement | Examination procedure | 11.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 15.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.11.2014 | AL | 29.06.2016 | CY | 29.06.2016 | CZ | 29.06.2016 | DK | 29.06.2016 | EE | 29.06.2016 | ES | 29.06.2016 | FI | 29.06.2016 | HR | 29.06.2016 | IT | 29.06.2016 | LT | 29.06.2016 | LV | 29.06.2016 | MC | 29.06.2016 | MK | 29.06.2016 | MT | 29.06.2016 | NL | 29.06.2016 | PL | 29.06.2016 | RO | 29.06.2016 | RS | 29.06.2016 | SE | 29.06.2016 | SI | 29.06.2016 | SK | 29.06.2016 | SM | 29.06.2016 | TR | 29.06.2016 | BG | 29.09.2016 | NO | 29.09.2016 | GR | 30.09.2016 | IS | 29.10.2016 | PT | 31.10.2016 | IE | 21.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 21.11.2014 | |
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
MK | 29.06.2016 | ||
MT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
TR | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 21.11.2014 | |
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
MK | 29.06.2016 | ||
MT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/34] | HU | 21.11.2014 | |
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
MK | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 21.11.2014 | |
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
MK | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 29.06.2016 | |
NO | 29.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002088257 (DIMIG STEVEN J [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0057]; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]DE10109609 (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,2* the whole document *; | [A]US2006053921 (KAWAMURA YUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0059]; figure 1, *; | [A]US2010083716 (FUKATSU TOMOHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0062] , [0066]; figures 1,4 *; | [A]DE102011120015 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * figure 1; claims 6,8,10 * | by applicant | DE10109609 |