Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11814227 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2023 | B2 | US2021047097 | 18.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017088357 | 03.11.2020 | US201715531263 | 26.05.2017 | EP14194891 | 26.11.2014 | WO2015EP77190 | 20.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10850901 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2020 | B2 | US2017327285 | 16.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14194891 | 26.11.2014 | WO2015EP77190 | 20.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111733623 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201580064363 | 20.11.2015 | EP14194891 | 26.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107002363B | Global Dossier | 10.07.2020 | B | CN107002363 | 01.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP14194891 | 26.11.2014 | WO2015EP77190 | 20.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2968469 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2022 | C | CA2968469 | 02.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14194891 | 26.11.2014 | WO2015EP77190 | 20.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2728404 | 29.07.2020 | C2 | RU2017117608 | 24.10.2019 | A3 | RU2017117608 | 26.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | EP14194891 | 26.11.2014 | WO2015EP77190 | 20.11.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016083252 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14194891 | 26.11.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3026173 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2022 | B2 | EP3026173 | 05.04.2017 | B1 | EP3026173 | 01.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14194891 | 26.11.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2629203T | 24.02.2023 | T5 | ES2629203T | 07.08.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP14194891 | 26.11.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI3026173T | 09.02.2023 | T4 | Priority number | Date | EP14194891 | 26.11.2014 |