EP3026173 - Method of producing a containerboard from pulp comprising NSSC pulp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/22] | Method of producing a containerboard from pulp comprising NSSC pulp | ||
[2017/02] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2022 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BillerudKorsnäs AB Box 703 169 27 Solna / SE | [2016/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nordström, Fredrik Gustaf Lovéns gata 12 SE-652 26 Karlstad / SE | [2016/22] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [2016/22] | Application number, filing date | 14194891.9 | 26.11.2014 | [2016/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3026173 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3026173 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3026173 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B65D65/40, B65D81/38, B65D85/24, D21H27/10, D21H27/40, D21F3/02, D21F11/12, D21H11/02, B65D85/34 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
B65D65/403 (EP,US);
D21F3/02 (CN,RU);
D21F11/12 (EP,CN,US);
B65D81/386 (EP,US);
B65D85/34 (EP,US);
D21F3/0209 (EP,US);
D21F3/0218 (EP,US);
D21H11/02 (EP,CN,US);
D21H27/10 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/22] | D21F3/02, D21F11/12, D21H11/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] |
Former [2016/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Kartonpappe aus Pulpe umfassend NSSC Pulpe | [2022/41] | English: | Method of producing a containerboard from pulp comprising NSSC pulp | [2022/41] | French: | Procédé de production d'un carton à partir de pulpe à papier comprenant NSSC pulpe | [2022/41] |
Former [2016/22] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Kartonpappe aus Pulpe umfassend NSSC Pulpe | ||
Former [2016/22] | Method of producing a containerboard from pulp comprising NSSC pulp | ||
Former [2016/22] | Procédé de production d'un carton à partir de pulpe à papier comprenant NSSC pulpe | Examination procedure | 02.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 02.11.2016 | Observations by third parties | 22.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.2018
16.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE Mondi AG Marxergasse 4A 1030 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Cunow, Gerda Cunow Patentanwalts KG Engerthstraße 146/3/1 1200 Wien / AT | 02
05.01.2018
20.05.2022
WITHDRAWN International Paper Company 6400 Poplar Avenue Memphis, TN 38197 / US Opponent's representative Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | 03
05.01.2018
16.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE Smurfit Kappa Ireland Limited Beech Hill Clonskeagh Dublin 4 / IE Opponent's representative FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | 04
05.01.2018
09.12.2021
WITHDRAWN Stora Enso Oyj P. O. Box 309 00101 Helsinki / FI Opponent's representative Forstmeyer, Dietmar Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.2018
16.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE Mondi AG Marxergasse 4A 1030 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Cunow, Gerda Cunow Patentanwalts KG Teschnergasse 33/1/3 1180 Wien / AT | ||
02
05.01.2018
20.05.2022
WITHDRAWN International Paper Company 6400 Poplar Avenue Memphis, TN 38197 / US Opponent's representative Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | |||
03
05.01.2018
16.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE Smurfit Kappa Ireland Limited Beech Hill Clonskeagh Dublin 4 / IE Opponent's representative FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | |||
04
05.01.2018
09.12.2021
WITHDRAWN Stora Enso Oyj P. O. Box 309 00101 Helsinki / FI Opponent's representative Forstmeyer, Dietmar BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | |||
Former [2022/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.2018
16.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE Mondi AG Marxergasse 4A 1030 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Cunow, Gerda Cunow Patentanwalts KG Teschnergasse 33/1/3 1180 Wien / AT | ||
02
05.01.2018
16.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE International Paper Company 6400 Poplar Avenue Memphis, TN 38197 / US Opponent's representative Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | |||
03
05.01.2018
16.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE Smurfit Kappa Ireland Limited Beech Hill Clonskeagh Dublin 4 / IE Opponent's representative FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | |||
04
05.01.2018
09.12.2021
WITHDRAWN Stora Enso Oyj P. O. Box 309 00101 Helsinki / FI Opponent's representative Forstmeyer, Dietmar BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | |||
Former [2020/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.2018
16.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE Mondi AG Marxergasse 4A 1030 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Cunow, Gerda Cunow Patentanwalts KG Teschnergasse 33/1/3 1180 Wien / AT | ||
02
05.01.2018
16.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE International Paper Company 6400 Poplar Avenue Memphis, TN 38197 / US Opponent's representative Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | |||
03
05.01.2018
16.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE Smurfit Kappa Ireland Limited Beech Hill Clonskeagh Dublin 4 / IE Opponent's representative FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | |||
04
05.01.2018
16.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE Stora Enso Oyj P. O. Box 309 00101 Helsinki / FI Opponent's representative Forstmeyer, Dietmar BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | |||
Former [2018/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE Mondi AG Marxergasse 4A 1030 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Cunow, Gerda Cunow Patentanwalts KG Teschnergasse 33/1/3 1180 Wien / AT | ||
02
05.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE International Paper Company 6400 Poplar Avenue Memphis, TN 38197 / US Opponent's representative Kunz, Herbert Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | |||
03
05.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE Smurfit Kappa Ireland Limited Beech Hill Clonskeagh Dublin 4 / IE Opponent's representative FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | |||
04
05.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE Stora Enso Oyj P. O. Box 309 00101 Helsinki / FI Opponent's representative Forstmeyer, Dietmar BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | 23.01.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.08.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.02.2020 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.06.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.06.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 25.10.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 06.04.2020 | Appeal received No. T0594/20 | 15.06.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.06.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 23.08.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 27.03.2020 | Appeal received No. T0594/20 | 12.06.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.06.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 23.08.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 24.03.2020 | Appeal received No. T0594/20 | 04.06.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.06.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 23.08.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 09.03.2020 | Appeal received No. T0594/20 | 02.06.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.06.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 23.08.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 30.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.11.2014 | AL | 05.04.2017 | AT | 05.04.2017 | CY | 05.04.2017 | CZ | 05.04.2017 | DK | 05.04.2017 | EE | 05.04.2017 | HR | 05.04.2017 | LT | 05.04.2017 | LV | 05.04.2017 | MC | 05.04.2017 | MK | 05.04.2017 | NL | 05.04.2017 | PL | 05.04.2017 | PT | 05.04.2017 | RO | 05.04.2017 | RS | 05.04.2017 | SI | 05.04.2017 | SK | 05.04.2017 | SM | 05.04.2017 | TR | 05.04.2017 | BG | 05.07.2017 | NO | 05.07.2017 | GR | 06.07.2017 | IS | 05.08.2017 | IE | 26.11.2017 | LU | 26.11.2017 | MT | 26.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 26.11.2014 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 26.11.2017 | ||
LU | 26.11.2017 | ||
MT | 26.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 26.11.2014 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 26.11.2017 | ||
LU | 26.11.2017 | ||
MT | 26.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 26.11.2014 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 26.11.2017 | ||
LU | 26.11.2017 | ||
MT | 26.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 26.11.2014 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 26.11.2017 | ||
LU | 26.11.2017 | ||
MT | 26.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 26.11.2014 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 26.11.2017 | ||
LU | 26.11.2017 | ||
MT | 26.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 26.11.2017 | ||
LU | 26.11.2017 | ||
MT | 26.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 26.11.2017 | ||
LU | 26.11.2017 | ||
MT | 26.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 26.11.2017 | ||
MT | 26.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 26.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 05.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9509946 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,6,8 * abstract *; | [Y]DE29923284U (VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECH PATENT [DE]) [Y] 1,2,5,6* the whole document *; | [Y]EP2022891 (VOITH PATENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,3,6,8 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0020]; claims 2,3,5-7,11-14 * | Opposition | EP0219643 | WO9509946 | DE29923284U | JP2008031585 | EP2022891 | US8142615 | WO2013050436 | US6322667 | US6730192 | WO2004038095 | EP0219643 | - "1 CARCANO. Semi-chemical Fluting Liner paper machine with (with) NSSC Pulp-Plant and Waste Paper Stock Preparation, 2600 mm", Wotol, (20110111), pages 1 - 8, URL: https://www.wotol.com/1-carcano-semi-chemical-fluting-liner-paper-machin/second-hand-machinery/prod_id/233884, XP055450276 | - "Intelli-Nip® Shoe Press", PMP Group, (20180103), URL: http://www.pmpgroup.com/technology/paper/new-sections/intelli-nip-shoe-press.html#/sigProldd90bc2d613, XP055450284 | - "PMP Group successfully implements ist intelli-nip® shoe press in china", Papnews - News, (20140512), pages 1 - 9, URL: https://www.papnews.com/pmp-group-successfully-implements-1st-intelli-nip-shoe-press-in-china/, (20180103), XP055450291 | - D. LANGE, "Shoe Pressing of Paper Grades", Papermakers Conference Proceedings, (19960000), pages 437 - 440, XP055451568 | - Summary of test results relating to commercially available flutings sold by BillerudKorsnas before the filing date | - B. PANCHAPAKESAN, "Press, Dryer Section Operation Affected by Recycled Fiber Use", Materials Science & Engineering Database, (19960400), vol. 70, no. 4, pages 115 - 118, XP055451551 | - Glossary of Papermaking Terms, (20180104), URL: www.pita.org.uk/images/PDF/Glossary of Terms.pdf | - E. BACK, "Using the Wet Press to Optimise Paper Properties", Pap. Technol. Ind., (19870400), vol. 28, no. 3, pages 454 - 455, XP055451807 | - I. PIKULIK et al., "The effects of shoe pressing on the properties of wood-containing papers", TAPPI JOURNA L, (20000800), vol. 83, no. 8, XP055451814 | - C. ZOTTERMAN, "New shoe press design now operational on world's largest linerboard machine", Papermakers Conference Proceedings, (19930000), pages 311 - 318, XP055451816 | - C. ZOTTERMAN, "The new shoe press in operation at Obbola, Gruvon, Pori and Kemsley mills", Paper Technology, (19940500), pages 18 - 23, XP055451818 | - Anonymous, "1 CARCANO. Semi-chemical Fluting Liner paper machine with (with) NSSC Pulp-Plant and Waste Paper Stock Preparation, 2600 mm, 112-240 gr / sqm, 300 tpd", WOTOL, (20120417), URL: https://web.archive.0rg/web/20120417235910/https://www.wotol.com/1-carcano-semi- chemical-fluting-liner-paper-machin/second-hand-machinery/prodid/233884, (20180104), XP055451882 | - Anonymous, "1 CARCANO. Semi-chemical Fluting Liner paper machine with (with) NSSC Pulp-Plant and Waste Paper Stock Preparation, 2600 mm, 112-240 gr / sqm, 300 tpd", WOTOL, (20110124), URL: https://www.wotol.com/1-carcano-semi-chemical-fluting-liner-paper-machin/second- hand-machinery/prod id/233884, XP055450276 | - D. V. LANGE, "Shoe Presses and their Application to Recycled Fibers", TAPPI Proceedings, 1991 Engineering Conference, (19910101), pages 51 - 54, XP055451562 | - D. LANGE et al., "Experiences with various shoe press applications", Pulp & Paper, Canada, (20060900), vol. 107, no. 9, pages 22 - 24, XP055451557 | - "Neuen Pressenpartie erhoht die Kapazitat", Wochenblatt fur Papierfabrikation, (20141000), pages 615 - 617, XP055451888 | - E.J. JUSTUS et al., "Extended Nip-Presse - Experimentelle und praktische Anwendung", Das Papier, (19820000), vol. 36, pages V152 - V158, XP055451896 | - E. BACK et al., "Multistage press drying of paper", Svensk Papperstidning, (19790000), pages 35 - 39, XP055451899 | - R. ROGUT, "Nowoczesne prasy a jakosc papieru", Przeglqd Papierniczy, (20060900), pages 525 - 529, XP055451901 | - BALA PANCHAPAKESAN, "Press, dryer section operation affected by recycled fiber use", Pulp & Paper, (19960400), vol. 70, no. 4, pages 115 - 118, XP055451551 | - DAVID LANGE et al., "Experiences with various shoe press applications", Materials Science & Engineering Database, (20060900), vol. 107, no. 9, pages 22 - 24, XP055451557 | - DAVID V. LANGE, "Shoe presses and their application to recycled fibers", Engineering Conference, (19910000), pages 51 - 54, XP055451562 | - DAVE LANGE, "Shoe pressing of paper grades", Papermakers Conference, (19960000), pages 437 - 440, XP055451568 | - JOHN SPACHMAN, "Not Just Hot Air", PaperAge, (20070500), pages 30 - 32, XP055451575 | - E. L. BACK et al., "The properties of NSSC-based and waste based corrugating", Paper Technology, (19891000), pages 16 - 23, XP055451580 | - Anonymous, "Optimization of machine properties for compressive strength: survey of factors affecting compressive strength", Project 2695-22, report one: a progress report to the Fourdrinier Kraft Board Group of the American Paper Institute, (19820315), pages 1 - 54, XP055451584 | - W. J. WHITSITT, "Compressive strength relationships and factors (IPC Technical Paper Series Number 163)", The Institute of Paper Chemistry, (19851000), XP055451602 | - G. CERAGIOLI et al., "Paper drying under Z-direction restraint to improve the strength properties of short-fiber high-yield pulps (Contract n° BOS-055-I)", G. CERAGIOLI et al., I F Hendry, W J H Hanssens, Pulp, Paper and Board, ELSEVIER APPLIED SCIENCE PUBLISHERS LTD, pages 138 - 148, XP055451607 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/I0.1007/978-94-009-1345-5 | - "Chapter 6 Structural mechanics of paper board", Papermaking Science and Technology, vol. 16, pages 210 - 213, ISBN 952-5216-16-0, XP055451648 | - ERNST L. BACK, "Press drying compared to other means of densifying paper", Tappi Journal, (19850300), vol. 68, no. 3, pages 92 - 96, XP055451658 | - Anonymous, "Paper and board - Compressive strangth - Short-span test", ISO 9895:2008(E), (20081015), XP055451662 | - M. GUNILLA, et al., "Note on the compression strength of fluting over a temperature and moisture range", Das Papier, (19850000), vol. 39, pages 302 - 305, XP055451789 | - D. I. ORLOFF et al., "Linerboard drying on a sheet-fed pilot impulse drying shoe press", Tappi Journal, (19950100), vol. 78, no. 1, pages 129 - 141, XP000486103 | - Dix and Roffael: Halbzellstoffe nach dem NSSC-Verfahren aus Pappelholz. 1989 | - Paper and Board Grades, 2000 | - Shuohui cl.al.. A comparison of the effects of papermaking.... 2005 | - ISO 9895, 2008 | - ISO 4046-1, 2002 | - Lavrov et al. The influence of Fiber Composition..., 2011. Including English translation | - Table of p.90 of D6 with calculated SCI’ index | - Machine translation of JP 2008031585 A | - WOTOL/Carcano. Semi Chemical fluting liner paper machine. 2011 | - Flyer PMP, Intelli-Nipshoe Press, 2018 | - Papnews. News from the paper industry sector. 2014 | - Lange, Shoe pressing of paper grades, 1996 | - Monica Öberg, personal declaration. 2018 | - Test results in connection with D18 | - Panchapakesan, Press Dryer Section Operation 1996 | - Glossary of papermaking terms, undated | - Back, Using the wet press to optimize paper properties, 1987 | - Pikulik et al, The effects of shoe pressing. 2000 | - Zotterman. New shoe press design, 1993 | - Zotterman: The new shoe press in Operation at Obbola..., 1994 | - WOTOL/Carcano. Semi Chemical fluting liner paper. 2012 | - Lange. Shoe presses and their application to recycled fibers. 1991 | - Lange. Experiences with various shoe press applications, 2006 | - Anon: Neue Pressenpartie erhöht die Kapazität, 2014 | - Justus et al.. Extended Nip-Presse, 1982 | - Back. Multistage press drying of paper, 1979 | - Rogut, Nowoczesne prasy a jakosc papieru, 2006 | - English translation of D32 | - English translation of D32 - Figures | - Spachman, Not just hot air. 2007 | - Back. The properties of NSSC-based and waste based corrugating. 1989 | - Fourdrinier Kraft Board Group, Optimization of machine properties, 1982 | - Whitsitt, Compressive strength relationships and factors. 1985 | - Hendry et al, Paper drying under z-direction restraint..., 1987 | - Papermaking Science and Technology. 1998 | - Richardson et al, Note on the compression strength of fluting..., 1985 | - Back. Press drying compared to other means of densifying paper. 1985 | - ISO 534:2011(E) | - Rydholm, Pulping Processes. 1965 | - Mondi. Investing in the future, undated | - Mondi, Higher Performance..., undated | - TAPPI Journal. Revisiting paper strength measurements.... 2007 | - EN 643. List of Grades of Paper and Board for Recycling. 2013 | - Cepi ContainerBoard, Liste der Europaischen Wellpappenpapiere, 2012 |