EP2876757 - Frame-type mounting adapter, assortment of frame-type mounting adapter and device with a housing and at least one frame-type mounting adapter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wago Verwaltungsgesellschaft mbH Hansastrasse 27 32423 Minden / DE | [2015/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gräfen, Stefan Paulinenstr. 12d DE - 32427 Minden / DE | 02 /
TÜRKEKÖLE, Muhammet ali Birkhuhnweg 26 DE - 32427 Minden / DE | [2018/33] |
Former [2015/22] | 01 /
Gräfen, Stefan Paulinenstr. 12d DE - 32427 Minden / DE | ||
02 /
TÜRKEKÖLE, Muhamment ali Birkhuhnweg 26 DE - 32427 Minden / DE | Representative(s) | Gerstein, Hans Joachim Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Freundallee 13 a 30173 Hannover / DE | [2018/33] |
Former [2015/22] | Gerstein, Hans Joachim Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Freundallee 13 30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 14194948.7 | 26.11.2014 | [2015/22] | Priority number, date | DE201320105376U | 26.11.2013 Original published format: DE 202013105376 U | [2015/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2876757 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2876757 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2876757 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/12 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
H02G3/123 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/51] |
Former [2015/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Rahmenartiger Montageadapter, Sortiment von rahmenartigen Montageadaptern und Einrichtung mit einem Gerätegehäuse und wenigstens einem rahmenartigen Montageadapter | [2015/22] | English: | Frame-type mounting adapter, assortment of frame-type mounting adapter and device with a housing and at least one frame-type mounting adapter | [2015/22] | French: | Adaptateur de montage sous forme de cadre, assortiment d'adaptateurs de montage sous forme de cadre et dispositif doté d'un boîtier d'appareil et d'au moins un adaptateur de montage sous forme de cadre | [2015/22] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2015 | Examination requested [2015/51] | 12.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.11.2014 | AL | 15.08.2018 | CY | 15.08.2018 | CZ | 15.08.2018 | DK | 15.08.2018 | EE | 15.08.2018 | ES | 15.08.2018 | FI | 15.08.2018 | HR | 15.08.2018 | IT | 15.08.2018 | LT | 15.08.2018 | LV | 15.08.2018 | MC | 15.08.2018 | MK | 15.08.2018 | MT | 15.08.2018 | NL | 15.08.2018 | PL | 15.08.2018 | PT | 15.08.2018 | RO | 15.08.2018 | RS | 15.08.2018 | SE | 15.08.2018 | SI | 15.08.2018 | SK | 15.08.2018 | SM | 15.08.2018 | TR | 15.08.2018 | BG | 15.11.2018 | GR | 16.11.2018 | GB | 26.11.2018 | IE | 26.11.2018 | LU | 26.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | FR | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | IS | 15.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
MT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PT | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
GB | 26.11.2018 | ||
IE | 26.11.2018 | ||
LU | 26.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
MT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
GB | 26.11.2018 | ||
IE | 26.11.2018 | ||
LU | 26.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
MT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
GB | 26.11.2018 | ||
IE | 26.11.2018 | ||
LU | 26.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
GB | 26.11.2018 | ||
IE | 26.11.2018 | ||
LU | 26.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IE | 26.11.2018 | ||
LU | 26.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IE | 26.11.2018 | ||
LU | 26.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IE | 26.11.2018 | ||
LU | 26.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
LU | 26.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
LU | 26.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
LU | 26.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 15.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6616005 (PEREIRA RAUL G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8-14 * figures 1, 3-4 * [Y] 5-7,15,16,21,22; | [X]WO2006115495 (BYRNE NORMAN R [US]) [X] 1,2,14 * figures 2, 8-10, 12, 14 *; | [Y]US8101860 (SHOTEY MARCUS J [US], et al) [Y] 5-7 * figure 13 *; | [Y]US3252611 (WEITZMAN MILTON J, et al) [Y] 22 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2012026714 (MARTINO BRIAN T [US], et al) [A] 1-3,14 * figure 1 * | [YA] - 312, "Bticino Multibox Catalogue 2008-2009", (20091231), URL: http://www.bticino.be/sites/default/files/Documentatie/Catalogi/Schakelmateriaal/NL/Pdf/Multibox.pdf, (20150518), XP055189698 [Y] 15,16,21 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,14 | Examination | US4875880 |