blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3026122

EP3026122 - Cellular-based method for determining the potency of defibrotide [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  23.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.06.2017  [2017/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gentium S.p.A.
Piazza XX Settembre 2
22079 Villa Guardia (Como) / IT
[2016/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Ignoni, Terenzio
Via Rigamonti 17/E
22020 San Fermo Della Battaglia (CO) / IT
02 / Kumar, Vijay
Via Galilei, 4
22070 Casnate (CO) / IT
03 / Verga, Claudio
Via Beltramo, 18
22070 Bregnano (CO) / IT
 [2016/22]
Representative(s)Pistolesi, Roberto, et al
Dragotti & Associati Srl
Via Nino Bixio, 7
20129 Milano / IT
[2016/22]
Application number, filing date14195277.027.11.2014
[2016/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3026122
Date:01.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2015
ClassificationIPC:C12Q1/68
[2016/22]
CPC:
G01N33/5014 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); G01N33/15 (IL,RU); A61K31/711 (KR);
G01N33/5008 (IL,RU); G01N33/5064 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Zellenbasiertes Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Wirksamkeit von Defibrotid[2016/22]
English:Cellular-based method for determining the potency of defibrotide[2016/22]
French:Procédé à base cellulaire pour déterminer la puissance de défibrotide[2016/22]
Examination procedure02.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/24]
24.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/24]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201603   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YA]WO2013190582  (GENTIUM SPA [IT], et al);
by applicantUS3770720
 US3829567
 US3899481
 US4694134
 US4693995
 US4693134
 US4938873
 US4985552
 US5081109
 US5116617
 US5223609
 US5646127
 US5646268
 US5977083
 US6046172
 US6699985
 US6767554
 US7338777
 US2008194506
 US2009131362
 US7575886
 US2011092576
 US2013231470
 US8551967
 WO2013190582
 US2014005256
 US8771663
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.