Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
08.02.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
05.01.2019 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
22.10.2018 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | |
21.09.2018 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
14.07.2018 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
06.07.2018 | First examination report | |
04.12.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.12.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.02.2016 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
12.02.2016 | Change - designated states | published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
14.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant | |
04.08.2015 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |