EP3025786 - Apparatus for simultaneous grinding and froth flotation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omya International AG Baslerstrasse 42 4665 Oftringen / CH | [2016/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steinwender, Michael Heinrich Heine Gasse 37 9020 Klagenfurt / AT | 02 /
Sötemann, Jörg Fritz-Rössler-Strasse 14a 79618 Rheinfelden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/32] | 01 /
Steinwender, Michael Heinrich Heine Gasse 37 9020 Klagenfurt / AT | ||
02 /
Sötemann, Jörg Fritz-Rössler-Strasse 14a 79618 Rheinfelden / AT | |||
Former [2016/22] | 01 /
Steinwender, Michael Heinrich Heine Gasse 37 9020 Klagenfurt / AT | ||
02 /
Sötemann, Jörg Italienerstrasse 35 9500 Villach / AT | Representative(s) | Tiefbrunner, Vera Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/22] | Tiefbrunner, Vera Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14195365.3 | 28.11.2014 | [2016/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3025786 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B03D1/08, B03D1/14, B02C17/16, B02C23/30 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
B03D1/087 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B03D1/028 (EP,KR,US);
B02C17/16 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B02C17/186 (US);
B02C17/161 (US);
B02C17/163 (US);
B02C17/1835 (US);
B02C17/184 (US);
B02C17/185 (US);
B02C23/14 (US);
B02C23/30 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B02C23/36 (US);
B03D1/016 (US);
B03D1/02 (US);
B03D1/082 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B03D1/1418 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B03D1/1456 (US);
B03D1/1462 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B03D1/1475 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B03D1/16 (US);
B03D1/26 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] | Extension states | BA | 28.11.2014 | ME | 28.11.2014 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum gleichzeitigen Mahlen und Schaumflotieren | [2016/22] | English: | Apparatus for simultaneous grinding and froth flotation | [2016/22] | French: | Appareil de broyage simultané et flottation par mousse | [2016/22] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2014 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 29.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/32] | 25.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE356815 (ELEKTRO OSMOSE AG GRAF SCHWERIN GES) [Y] 1-16 * page 1 - page 2; figures 1-2 *; | [XA]US5167375 (DATTA RABINDER S [US]) [X] 17 * the whole document *[A] 1-16; | [XDY]CA2059713 (FALCONBRIDGE LTD [CA], et al) [XD] 17 * page 2 - page 7; figures 1-2 * [Y] 1-16 | by applicant | US4109874 | CA2059713 | CN2497869Y | CN1401434 | WO2008084391 | CN201423313Y | CN101757981 | WO2014029634 | EP2722368 | EP2770017 |