EP2999077 - An energy management device and an electrical installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clean Power Solutions Ltd 47 Smithy Lane Scarisbrick, Lancashire L40 8HH / GB | [2016/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hough, Michael 47 Smithy Lane Scarisbrick, L40 8HH / GB | 02 /
Stanton, Marc 47 Smithy Lane Scarisbrick, L40 8HH / GB | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | Hutchinson, Thomas Owen Hutchinson IP Ltd 57 Hoghton Street Southport, Merseyside PR9 0PG / GB | [2016/12] | Application number, filing date | 14196138.3 | 03.12.2014 | [2016/12] | Priority number, date | deleted | [2017/19] |
Former [2016/12] | GB20140016414 | 17.09.2014 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2999077 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/32, H02J3/38, // H02J3/00, H02J9/00 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
H02J3/32 (EP,GB,US);
H02J3/382 (GB);
H02J3/381 (EP,GB,US);
H02J2300/24 (EP,GB,US);
H02J3/008 (EP,US);
H02J3/40 (EP,GB,US);
H02J9/00 (EP);
Y02E10/56 (EP);
Y02E10/76 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] |
Former [2016/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ein Energiemanagementvorrichtung und eine elektrische Installation | [2016/12] | English: | An energy management device and an electrical installation | [2016/12] | French: | Un dispositif de gestion de l'énergie et une installation électrique | [2016/12] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2016 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 16.06.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 09.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/42] | 26.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/48] | 25.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2012153726 (MOON CHONG-SOP [KR]) [X] 1-5,9-12,14 * abstract * * figures 8-10 * * paragraphs [0066] , [0076] - [0078] - [0100] - [0105] * [Y] 6,7,13,15; | [A]JP2013051833 (NICHICON CORP) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]EP2582013 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 6,15 * abstract * * figures 36-39 * * figures 1,3 * * paragraphs [0036] - [0039] *; | [Y]EP2763265 (KYOCERA CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 7,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0048] * * figure 6 * |