EP2889052 - Posture correction apparatus and posture correction method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ajiki, Kaori c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd., IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Minowa, Toshimitsu c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd., IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Takeshita, Sachiko c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd., IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/27] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/27] | Application number, filing date | 14196205.0 | 04.12.2014 | [2015/27] | Priority number, date | JP20130272301 | 27.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013272301 | [2015/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2889052 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/04, A61N1/36 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
A61N1/36003 (EP,US);
A61N1/0452 (EP,US);
A61N1/0476 (EP,US);
A61N1/0484 (EP,US);
A61N1/37264 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] |
Former [2015/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Haltungskorrekturvorrichtung und Haltungskorrekturverfahren | [2015/27] | English: | Posture correction apparatus and posture correction method | [2015/27] | French: | Appareil de correction de posture et procédé de correction de posture | [2015/27] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/04] | 29.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2013113099 (PREV BIOTECH INC [CA]) [X] 1-5,8,10 * abstract * * page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 11 * * page 7, line 11 - page 10, line 14 * * page 11, line 6 - page 13, line 13 *; | [X]DE102011014624 (VIEMEDIC GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-8,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0 12] , [0 18] - [0019] - [0 23] *; | [X]WO2013188650 (ARTICULATE LABS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] - [0029] - [0 63] - [0064] *; | [X]US2008097530 (MUCCIO PHILIP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0029] *; | [X]DE202012102393U (FRITZSCHE DIRK [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-8,10 * paragraphs [0009] - [0010] - [0 18] , [0 32] - [0033]; figure 1 *; | [A]CN103446669 (JIANGSU SANWE MEDICAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2002238930 | JPH04312472 | JP2011505897 | JP5197960B | JP2007178256 | JP2013168575 |