EP2886302 - METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF REINFORCED MATERIALS AND MATERIAL THAT CAN BE OBTAINED FROM THIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/26] | Method for the manufacture of reinforced materials and material that can be obtained from this method | ||
[2020/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2021 Database last updated on 22.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Defence and Space GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Straße 1 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [2020/23] |
Former [2015/26] | For all designated states Airbus Defence and Space GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Straße 1 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weimer, Christian Perlacher Strasse 50 81539 München / DE | 02 /
Parlevliet, Patricia Perlacher Strasse 50 81539 München / DE | [2015/26] | Representative(s) | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/23] | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf PartG mbB Patentanwälte Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/26] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14196374.4 | 04.12.2014 | [2015/26] | Priority number, date | DE20131018158 | 05.12.2013 Original published format: DE102013018158 | [2015/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2886302 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2886302 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2886302 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/02, // B29K105/04, B29C65/36, B29L31/30, B29C65/16, B29C65/14, B29L31/60 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
B29C66/72525 (EP,US);
B32B37/06 (US);
B29C65/02 (EP,US);
B29C66/7254 (EP,US);
B29C66/727 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B32B37/04 (US);
B32B37/142 (US);
B32B37/182 (US);
B29C65/14 (EP,US);
B29C65/16 (EP,US);
B29C65/167 (EP,US);
B29C65/3612 (EP,US);
B29C65/3676 (EP,US);
B29C66/474 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/721 (EP,US);
B29C66/7212 (EP,US);
B29C66/73771 (EP,US);
B29C66/73773 (EP,US);
B29C66/91943 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2027/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2071/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2075/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2077/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2079/08 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2079/085 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2081/06 (EP,US);
B29C66/7212, B29K2277/10 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2015/26] | B29C65/02, // B29K105/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/34] |
Former [2015/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERSTÄRKTEN MATERIALIEN UND MATERIAL ERHÄLTLICH AUS DIESEM VERFAHREN | [2020/02] | English: | METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF REINFORCED MATERIALS AND MATERIAL THAT CAN BE OBTAINED FROM THIS METHOD | [2020/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE MATÉRIAUX RENFORCÉS ET MATÉRIEL OBTENU À PARTIR DE CE PROCÉDÉ | [2020/02] |
Former [2015/26] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von verstärkten Materialien und Material erhältlich aus diesem Verfahren | ||
Former [2015/26] | Method for the manufacture of reinforced materials and material that can be obtained from this method | ||
Former [2015/26] | Procédé de fabrication de matériaux renforcés et matériel obtenu à partir de ce procédé | Examination procedure | 13.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/34] | 09.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2014 | AL | 03.06.2020 | CY | 03.06.2020 | CZ | 03.06.2020 | DK | 03.06.2020 | EE | 03.06.2020 | ES | 03.06.2020 | FI | 03.06.2020 | HR | 03.06.2020 | IT | 03.06.2020 | LT | 03.06.2020 | LV | 03.06.2020 | MC | 03.06.2020 | MK | 03.06.2020 | MT | 03.06.2020 | NL | 03.06.2020 | PL | 03.06.2020 | RO | 03.06.2020 | RS | 03.06.2020 | SE | 03.06.2020 | SI | 03.06.2020 | SK | 03.06.2020 | SM | 03.06.2020 | TR | 03.06.2020 | BG | 03.09.2020 | NO | 03.09.2020 | GR | 04.09.2020 | IS | 03.10.2020 | PT | 06.10.2020 | AT | 04.12.2020 | IE | 04.12.2020 | LU | 04.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | FR | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 04.12.2014 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
MK | 03.06.2020 | ||
MT | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
TR | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
AT | 04.12.2020 | ||
IE | 04.12.2020 | ||
LU | 04.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 04.12.2014 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
MT | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
TR | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
AT | 04.12.2020 | ||
IE | 04.12.2020 | ||
LU | 04.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
AT | 04.12.2020 | ||
IE | 04.12.2020 | ||
LU | 04.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
IE | 04.12.2020 | ||
LU | 04.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
IE | 04.12.2020 | ||
LU | 04.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
IE | 04.12.2020 | ||
LU | 04.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
IE | 04.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 03.06.2020 | |
NO | 03.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9312344 (JAEGER EBERHARD GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4,6,8,12 * the whole document * [I] 2,3,5,7,9-11,13; | [A]US5589015 (FUSCO THOMAS M [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9829243 (AZTEX INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US5832594 (AVILA STEVEN J [US]) [A] 1-13* the whole document * | by applicant | DE102005024408 | WO2007012353 |