Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9758041 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2017 | B2 | US2016061132 | 03.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014179161 | 03.09.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5945572B | Global Dossier | 05.07.2016 | B2 | JP2016053324 | 14.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014179161 | 03.09.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2993333 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2016 | B1 | EP2993333 | 09.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014179161 | 03.09.2014 |