EP2965929 - Wheel mounting system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [2021/05] |
Former [2016/02] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OBEROI, Harinder S c/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | 02 /
KOZAK, Michael J c/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | 03 /
DO, Quang T c/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | 04 /
REESE, Richard Griffith, IV c/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | 05 /
MILLER, Jeffrey Lawrence c/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | 06 /
GUDZINSKI, Gregory c/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | [2016/02] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2021/05] |
Former [2016/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 14196476.7 | 05.12.2014 | [2016/02] | Priority number, date | US201462022641P | 09.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462022641 P | [2016/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2965929 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2965929 | Date: | 03.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B21J15/02, B21J15/10, B21J15/14, B25J5/00, B25J11/00, B64F5/10, B60G3/14 | [2019/46] | CPC: |
B21J15/02 (EP,US);
B64C1/00 (EP,BR,CN,KR,US);
B64F5/10 (EP,BR,KR,US);
G05B19/418 (CN);
B21J15/28 (US);
B21J15/10 (EP,US);
B21J15/142 (EP,US);
B21J15/32 (US);
B21J15/40 (US);
B23P19/10 (US);
B25B5/163 (US);
B25J11/005 (US);
B25J11/007 (EP,US);
B25J5/007 (EP,US);
B25J9/1682 (US);
B25J9/1687 (US);
B25J9/1697 (US);
B29C39/026 (US);
B29C39/10 (US);
B29C39/123 (US);
B29C39/22 (US);
B29C45/14336 (US);
B29C65/70 (US);
B60G3/145 (EP,US);
B60G7/001 (US);
B60G7/008 (US);
B64C1/06 (EP,BR,CN,KR,US);
B64C1/068 (EP,BR,CN,KR,US);
B64C1/12 (BR);
B64F5/50 (KR,US);
F16B19/06 (US);
G05B19/41805 (US);
G05B19/41865 (CN);
G05D1/0088 (US);
G05D3/12 (US);
B23P21/002 (US);
B23P2700/00 (US);
B23P2700/01 (US);
B29C2045/14368 (US);
B29C2793/0081 (EP,US);
B29K2715/00 (US);
B29L2031/748 (US);
B60G2204/143 (EP,US);
B60G2204/418 (EP,US);
B60G2206/8207 (EP,US);
B60G2300/60 (EP,US);
B60P3/025 (US);
B64C1/069 (EP,BR,CN,KR,US);
B64C2001/0072 (BR);
G05B2219/45071 (US);
G05B2219/45226 (CN);
Y02P90/80 (EP,US);
Y10S901/01 (EP,US);
Y10S901/02 (EP,US);
Y10S901/41 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/02] | B60G3/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/02] | Title | German: | Radbefestigungssystem | [2016/02] | English: | Wheel mounting system | [2016/02] | French: | Système de montage de roue | [2016/02] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2014 | Examination requested [2016/02] | 06.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.12.2014 | AL | 03.02.2021 | AT | 03.02.2021 | CY | 03.02.2021 | CZ | 03.02.2021 | DK | 03.02.2021 | EE | 03.02.2021 | ES | 03.02.2021 | FI | 03.02.2021 | HR | 03.02.2021 | IT | 03.02.2021 | LT | 03.02.2021 | LV | 03.02.2021 | MC | 03.02.2021 | MK | 03.02.2021 | MT | 03.02.2021 | NL | 03.02.2021 | PL | 03.02.2021 | RO | 03.02.2021 | RS | 03.02.2021 | SE | 03.02.2021 | SI | 03.02.2021 | SK | 03.02.2021 | SM | 03.02.2021 | BG | 03.05.2021 | NO | 03.05.2021 | GR | 04.05.2021 | IS | 03.06.2021 | PT | 04.06.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 05.12.2014 | |
AL | 03.02.2021 | ||
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CY | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
MK | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 05.12.2014 | |
AL | 03.02.2021 | ||
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CY | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/28] | HU | 05.12.2014 | |
AL | 03.02.2021 | ||
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2153221 (JAMER JACQUES); | [XI]US4172591 (CRAIG FRED A [US]); | [XI]FR2706369 (GIAT IND SA [FR]) |