EP2889138 - Resin composition for laser engraving, flexographic printing plate precursor for laser engraving and process for producing same, and process for making flexographic printing plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/27] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugasaki, Atsushi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | [2015/27] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/27] | Application number, filing date | 14196934.5 | 09.12.2014 | [2015/27] | Priority number, date | JP20130271094 | 27.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013271094 | [2015/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2889138 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/05 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
B41C1/05 (EP);
B41N1/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Harzzusammensetzung für Lasergravierung, Flexodruckplattenvorläufer für Lasergravierung und Verfahren zur Herstellung davon sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Flexodruckplatte | [2015/27] | English: | Resin composition for laser engraving, flexographic printing plate precursor for laser engraving and process for producing same, and process for making flexographic printing plate | [2015/27] | French: | Composition de résine pour gravure au laser, précurseur de plaque d'impression flexographique pour gravure au laser, son procédé de production et procédé de fabrication de plaque d'impression flexographique | [2015/27] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/28] | 09.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1167025 (JSR CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,7-15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0024] , [0027] , [0030] , [0031]; examples 1-6; claims 1-12 * [Y] 6; | [Y]EP2602110 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0131] - [0137]; claims 1-15 * | by applicant | JP2007520379 | JP2002003665 | JP2002103539 | JP2011136455 | JP2010208326 | JP2012045801 | JP2008063554 | JPH11106543 | JPS4627926B | JPS5147334B | JPS57196231 | JPS595240 | JPS595241 | JPH02226149 | JPH01165613 | JPS5421726B | JPS4841708B | JPS5137193 | JPH0232293B | JPH0216765B | JPS5849860B | JPS5617654B | JPS6239417B | JPS6239418B | JPS63277653 | JPS63260909 | JPH01105238 | JPS4864183 | JPS4943191B | JPS5230490B | JPS4643946B | JPH0140337B | JPH0140336B | JPH0225493 | JPS6122048 | JP2009204962 | JP2009178869 | JP2009172658 | JP2009214334 | - JOURNAL OF THE ADHESION SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (1984), vol. 20, no. 7, pages 300 - 308 | - ., Laser Handbook, 2nd ed., THE LASER SOCIETY OF JAPAN, APPLIED LASER TECHNOLOGY, THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS |