EP2893799 - Agricultural round baler and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gärtner, Jürgen Friedhofstr. 19 67580 Hamm / DE | 02 /
Ostermann, Philippe A Rue Georges Simenon, 2 21000 Dijon / FR | [2015/29] | Representative(s) | Reichert, Christian John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Mannheim Regional Center Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2015/29] | Application number, filing date | 14197155.6 | 10.12.2014 | [2015/29] | Priority number, date | DE201410200449 | 13.01.2014 Original published format: DE102014200449 | [2015/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2893799 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/07 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
A01F15/0715 (EP,US);
A01F15/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] |
Former [2015/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Landwirtschaftliche Rundballenpresse und Verfahren | [2015/29] | English: | Agricultural round baler and method | [2015/29] | French: | Presse à balles rondes agricole et procédé | [2015/29] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 16.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/28] | 23.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2011012955 (AGCO CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7 * paragraphs [0018] - [0030] * [I] 4-6; | [X]US4731984 (VAN DER LELY CORNELIS [CH]) [X] 1,7 * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 63 * * column 8, line 45 - column 10, line 10 *; | [X]EP2382858 (DEERE & CO [US]) [X] 1,7 * paragraphs [0022] - [0024] *; | [X]US2826985 (HARRER PAUL H) [X] 1,7 * column 1, lines 19-44 * * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 64; claim 1 * |