EP2896328 - Tree stand [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F-H-S International GmbH & Co. KG An der Eickesmühle 35 41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2015/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulz, Rainer Berchtesgadner Straße 35A 5020 Salzburg / AT | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | Richly & Ritschel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 100411 51404 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | Kierdorf Ritschel Richly Patentanwälte PartG mbB Sattlerweg 14 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2015/30] | Kierdorf Ritschel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Sattlerweg 14 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 14197280.2 | 11.12.2014 | [2015/30] | Priority number, date | DE20141000420 | 17.01.2014 Original published format: DE102014000420 | [2015/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2896328 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2896328 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A47G33/12 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
A47G33/1213 (EP);
A47G2033/1286 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Title | German: | Baumständer | [2015/30] | English: | Tree stand | [2015/30] | French: | Support pour arbre | [2015/30] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 06.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2014 | AL | 14.09.2016 | CY | 14.09.2016 | CZ | 14.09.2016 | EE | 14.09.2016 | ES | 14.09.2016 | FI | 14.09.2016 | HR | 14.09.2016 | IT | 14.09.2016 | LT | 14.09.2016 | LV | 14.09.2016 | MC | 14.09.2016 | MK | 14.09.2016 | MT | 14.09.2016 | RO | 14.09.2016 | RS | 14.09.2016 | SE | 14.09.2016 | SI | 14.09.2016 | SK | 14.09.2016 | SM | 14.09.2016 | TR | 14.09.2016 | IE | 11.12.2016 | LU | 11.12.2016 | BG | 14.12.2016 | NO | 14.12.2016 | GR | 15.12.2016 | BE | 31.12.2016 | FR | 02.01.2017 | IS | 14.01.2017 | PT | 16.01.2017 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 11.12.2014 | |
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
MT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
TR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 11.12.2016 | ||
LU | 11.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 11.12.2014 | |
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
MT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 11.12.2016 | ||
LU | 11.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 11.12.2014 | |
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 11.12.2016 | ||
LU | 11.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 14.09.2016 | |
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 11.12.2016 | ||
LU | 11.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 14.09.2016 | |
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 14.09.2016 | |
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 14.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1318740 (KRINNER INNOVATION GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033]; figures 2, 4, 5 *; | [A]DE10000879 (GRASSKAMP HANS JOACHIM [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 4 * | by applicant | DE3932473 |