EP2991109 - Integrated capacitor in an integrated circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MediaTek Inc. No. 1 Dusing Rd. 1st Science-Based Industrial Park Hsin-Chu 300 / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2016/09] | For all designated states MediaTek, Inc No. 1 Dusing Rd. 1st Science-Based Industrial Park Hsin-Chu 300 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Shi-Bai 13F.-1, No.85, Sec. 2 Jiafeng 6th Rd. 302 Zhubei City, Hsinchu County / TW | 02 /
Lee, Tung-Hsing 2F., No.5, Alley 34, Lane 36 Jhongshan 2nd Rd. 247 Luzhou Dist., New Taipei City / TW | [2016/09] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2016/09] | Application number, filing date | 14197607.6 | 12.12.2014 | [2016/09] | Priority number, date | US201414337216 | 22.07.2014 Original published format: US201414337216 | [2016/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2991109 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2991109 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/522, H01L49/02, H01L27/06 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
H01L27/0629 (EP,US);
H01L28/86 (US);
H01L28/87 (EP,US);
H01L23/5223 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/40] |
Former [2016/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Integrierter Kondensator in einer integrierten Schaltung | [2016/09] | English: | Integrated capacitor in an integrated circuit | [2016/09] | French: | Condensateur intégré dans un circuit intégré | [2016/09] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/40] | 15.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/49] | 05.07.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.08.2018 | 27.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/49] | 15.08.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009090951 (CHANG CHUNG-LONG [TW], et al); | [X]US2011210384 (XIA WEI [US], et al) |