Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9246045 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2016 | B2 | US2015171259 | 18.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1302934 | 13.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2884547 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2016 | B1 | EP2884547 | 17.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1302934 | 13.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3015114 | 01.01.2016 | B1 | FR3015114 | 19.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1302934 | 13.12.2013 |