EP2928185 - Moving picture encoding method and decoding method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 c/o Sakura Sogo Jimusho 1-11 Kanda Jimbocho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0051 / JP | [2015/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abe, Kiyofumi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Kadono, Shinya c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Kondo, Satoshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
Hagai, Makoto c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2017/36] |
Former [2015/41] | 01 /
Abe, Kiyofumi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku / Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
Kadono, Shinya c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku / Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | |||
03 /
Kondo, Satoshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku / Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | |||
04 /
Hagai, Makoto c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku / Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2015/41] | Application number, filing date | 14197723.1 | 22.07.2003 | [2015/41] | Priority number, date | JP20020232160 | 08.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002232160 | JP20020273992 | 19.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002273992 | JP20020289294 | 01.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002289294 | JP20020296726 | 09.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002296726 | JP20020370722 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002370722 | JP20030008751 | 16.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003008751 | [2015/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2928185 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2928185 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/105, H04N19/117, H04N19/134, H04N19/147, H04N19/172, H04N19/174, H04N19/176, H04N19/18, H04N19/42, H04N19/46, H04N19/573, H04N19/577, H04N19/58, H04N19/61, H04N19/70 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
H04N19/105 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/103 (US);
H04N19/117 (EP,US);
H04N19/134 (EP,US);
H04N19/137 (US);
H04N19/139 (US);
H04N19/147 (EP,US);
H04N19/159 (US);
H04N19/172 (EP,US);
H04N19/174 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/177 (US);
H04N19/18 (EP,US);
H04N19/182 (US);
H04N19/42 (EP,US);
H04N19/46 (EP,US);
H04N19/51 (KR);
H04N19/573 (EP,US);
H04N19/577 (EP,US);
H04N19/58 (EP,US);
H04N19/593 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/41] | Title | German: | Kodierungsverfahren für bewegte Bilder und Dekodierungsverfahren | [2015/41] | English: | Moving picture encoding method and decoding method | [2015/41] | French: | Procédé de codage d'image en mouvement et procédé de décodage | [2015/41] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/41] | 24.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03741520.5 / EP1530374 | EP07123844.8 / EP1906671 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.09.2017 | DK | 06.09.2017 | FI | 06.09.2017 | IT | 06.09.2017 | MC | 06.09.2017 | PT | 06.09.2017 | RO | 06.09.2017 | SE | 06.09.2017 | SI | 06.09.2017 | BG | 06.12.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | DK | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | DK | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | DK | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | DK | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 06.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - THOMAS WIEGAND, "DRAFT ISO/IEC 14496-10 : 2002 (E)", 3. JVT MEETING; 60. MPEG MEETING; 06-05-2002 - 10-05-2002; FAIRFAX,US; (JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16), (20020510), no. JVT-C167, ISSN 0000-0442, pages i-ix, 1 - 132, XP030005278 [X] 1,2 * pages 1-5, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 34, paragraph 8.4 - page 58, paragraph 9.4.3.3 * * page 99, paragraph 11 - page 106, paragraph 11.5.2 * | [X] - WIEGAND, "Editor's proposed revision of CD relative to JVT-D015d5", 4. JVT MEETING; 61. MPEG MEETING; 22-07-2002 - 26-07-2002; KLAGENFURT,AT; (JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16), (20020726), no. JVT-D017d2, ISSN 0000-0441, XP030005292 [X] 1,2 * pages 33-37, paragraph 8.3 - paragraph 8.4.3.4 * * page 39, paragraph 8.6.3 * * pages 40-45, paragraph 9.2.1 - paragraph 9.2.2.4 * * This document is referred to as "JVT standard" in the abstract of document JVT-D155. * | [I] - JVT, "B Picture Design Output Document", 4. JVT MEETING; 61. MPEG MEETING; 22-07-2002 - 26-07-2002; KLAGENFURT,AT; (JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20020726), no. JVT-D155, ISSN 0000-0439, XP030005418 [I] 1,2 * the whole document * | [XP] - WIEGAND T, "TEXT OF FINAL COMMITTEE DRAFT OF JOINT VIDEO SPECIFICATION (ITU-T REC. H.264 / ISO/IEC 14496-10 AVC)MPEG02/N4920", ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 MPEG02/N4920, KLAGENFURT, AT, (20020811), pages I - XV,1-197, XP001100641 [XP] 1,2 * pages 1-5, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * * pages 37-42, paragraph 7.4.3 - paragraph 7.4.3.3 * * pages 46-47, paragraph 7.4.5.1 * * pages 53-59, paragraph 8.3.6 - paragraph 8.3.6.8 * * pages 119-121, paragraph 10.4 - paragraph 10.4.3 * | [XP] - KADONO, "Implicit Weighted Bi-prediction using DC Offset", 5. JVT MEETING; 14-10-2002 - 18-10-2002; GENEVA, CH; (JOINT VIDEO TEAMOF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20021018), no. JVT-E077, ISSN 0000-0432, XP030005494 [XP] 1,2 * the whole document * | [AP] - SULLIVAN, "Various Clean-Up Issues", 5. JVT MEETING; 14-10-2002 - 18-10-2002; GENEVA, CH; (JOINT VIDEO TEAMOF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20021018), no. JVT-E123, ISSN 0000-0432, XP030005536 [AP] 1,2 * pages 1-2, paragraph 2.2 * * This document makes clear that document JVT-D157 reflects modifications approved during the JVT meeting in Klagenfurt, terminated on 26.07.2011, and, therefore, knowledge at that date. * | [A] - BOYCE, "Adaptive ref. picture weighting using ref. pic. index", 4. JVT MEETING; 61. MPEG MEETING; 22-07-2002 - 26-07-2002; KLAGENFURT,AT; (JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20020726), no. JVT-D122, ISSN 0000-0439, XP030005394 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * |