EP2991441 - A transceiver, a sudac, a method for signal processing in a transceiver, and methods for signal processing in a sudac [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/09] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Breiling, Marco Christian-Ernst-Str. 8 91052 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Burkhardt, Frank Fenzelstr. 8 90768 Fürth / DE | 03 /
Rohde, Christian Noethestraße 67 91058 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
Ng, Wing Kwan Hartmannstr. 128 91058 Erlangen / DE | 05 /
Schober, Robert Kehlmünz 11 90599 Dietenhofen / DE | [2016/09] | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2016/09] | Application number, filing date | 14198339.5 | 16.12.2014 | [2016/09] | Priority number, date | EP20140182552 | 27.08.2014 Original published format: EP 14182552 | [2016/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2991441 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2991441 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/04, H04L25/03 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
H04W88/04 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
H04L25/0204 (EP,IL,RU,US);
H04L25/03159 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
H04B7/15528 (KR);
H04B7/15564 (KR);
H04L25/0224 (EP,IL,RU,US);
H04L25/03343 (EP,IL,RU,US);
H04L25/03891 (EP,IL,RU,US);
H04L27/2695 (KR);
H04L2025/03426 (EP,IL,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sender-Empfänger, SUDAC, Verfahren zur Signalverarbeitung in einem Sender-Empfänger und Verfahren zur Signalverarbeitung in einem SUDAC | [2016/09] | English: | A transceiver, a sudac, a method for signal processing in a transceiver, and methods for signal processing in a sudac | [2016/09] | French: | Émetteur-récepteur, sudac, procédé de traitement de signaux dans un émetteur-récepteur et procédés de traitement de signaux dans un sudac | [2016/09] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 10.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3180938 (GLOMB WALTER L [US]); | [A]EP1109332 (ANDREW CORP [CH]); | [A]WO2004064298 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al); | [A]US2005025085 (KING WAYNE G [US]); | [A]EP1755354 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2011018892 (SONY CORP [JP], et al); | [A]US2012014417 (HEATH JR ROBERT W [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2008069555 | CN102281129 | CN102546127 | CN102833193 |