EP2889627 - SAMPLE ANALYZING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/27] | Sample processing apparatus | ||
[2021/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYSMEX CORPORATION 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | [2021/41] |
Former [2015/27] | For all designated states SYSMEX CORPORATION 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagai, Takaaki c/o SYSMEX CORPORATION 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | 02 /
Fukuma, Daigo c/o SYSMEX CORPORATION 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | 03 /
Yamasaki, Mitsuo c/o SYSMEX CORPORATION 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | 04 /
Nakanishi, Noriyuki c/o SYSMEX CORPORATION 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | 05 /
Yao, Syunsuke c/o SYSMEX CORPORATION 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | 06 /
Okazaki, Tomonori c/o SYSMEX CORPORATION 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | 07 /
Saino, Takahiro c/o SYSMEX CORPORATION 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | [2021/41] |
Former [2015/27] | 01 /
Nagai, Takaaki c/o SYSMEX CORPORATION 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo, 651-0073 / JP | ||
02 /
Fukuma, Daigo c/o SYSMEX CORPORATION 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo, 651-0073 / JP | |||
03 /
Yamasaki, Mitsuo c/o SYSMEX CORPORATION 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo, 651-0073 / JP | |||
04 /
Nakanishi, Noriyuki c/o SYSMEX CORPORATION 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo, 651-0073 / JP | |||
05 /
Yao, Syunsuke c/o SYSMEX CORPORATION 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo, 651-0073 / JP | |||
06 /
Okazaki, Tomonori c/o SYSMEX CORPORATION 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo, 651-0073 / JP | |||
07 /
Saino, Takahiro c/o SYSMEX CORPORATION 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo, 651-0073 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/27] | Application number, filing date | 14198858.4 | 18.12.2014 | [2015/27] | Priority number, date | JP20130272561 | 27.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013272561 | [2015/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2889627 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2889627 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/04 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
G01N35/04 (EP,US);
G01N1/28 (US);
B01L9/06 (US);
G01N2035/0412 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0498 (EP,US);
G01N35/0099 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] |
Former [2015/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PROBENANALYSEGERÄT | [2021/10] | English: | SAMPLE ANALYZING APPARATUS | [2021/10] | French: | APPAREIL D'ANALYSE D'ÉCHANTILLONS | [2021/10] |
Former [2015/27] | Probenverarbeitungsvorrichtung | ||
Former [2015/27] | Sample processing apparatus | ||
Former [2015/27] | Appareil de traitement d'échantillons | Examination procedure | 18.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/04] | 04.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21202105.9 / EP3958000 | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.12.2014 | AL | 08.12.2021 | AT | 08.12.2021 | CY | 08.12.2021 | CZ | 08.12.2021 | DK | 08.12.2021 | EE | 08.12.2021 | ES | 08.12.2021 | FI | 08.12.2021 | HR | 08.12.2021 | IT | 08.12.2021 | LT | 08.12.2021 | LV | 08.12.2021 | MC | 08.12.2021 | MK | 08.12.2021 | MT | 08.12.2021 | NL | 08.12.2021 | PL | 08.12.2021 | RO | 08.12.2021 | RS | 08.12.2021 | SE | 08.12.2021 | SI | 08.12.2021 | SK | 08.12.2021 | SM | 08.12.2021 | IE | 18.12.2021 | LU | 18.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | CH | 31.12.2021 | LI | 31.12.2021 | BG | 08.03.2022 | NO | 08.03.2022 | GR | 09.03.2022 | IS | 08.04.2022 | PT | 08.04.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 18.12.2014 | |
AL | 08.12.2021 | ||
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CY | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
IT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
MK | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 18.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 18.12.2014 | |
AL | 08.12.2021 | ||
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CY | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
IT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 18.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 18.12.2014 | |
AL | 08.12.2021 | ||
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
IT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 18.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 18.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 18.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 18.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 18.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 08.12.2021 | |
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 08.12.2021 | |
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | ES | 08.12.2021 | |
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | ES | 08.12.2021 | |
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | ES | 08.12.2021 | |
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | ES | 08.12.2021 | |
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | ES | 08.12.2021 | |
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 08.12.2021 | |
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 08.12.2021 | |
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 08.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2004134750 (LUOMA ROBERT PAUL [US]) [X] 1,8-10 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraphs [0044] - [0054] * * figures 1,3,4,6 * [Y] 3-7,11; | [Y]US7141213 (PANG WING S [US], et al) [Y] 3-6,11 * figures 1,4,13C * * column 6, lines 51-54 * * column 21, lines 22-58 *; | [YA]US2009325274 (HAMADA YUICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 4,11 * paragraphs [0051] - [0053] * * figure 3 * [A] 3; | [A]EP2455762 (M U T AG MESSGERAETE FUER MEDIZIN UND UMWELTTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1-12* figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US2013129166 (MUELLER MARTIN [DE], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0047] * * figure 2 *; | [XP]EP2711715 (SYSMEX CORP [JP]) [XP] 1,2,12 * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0054] * * figures 3,4,7 * | by applicant | JP2007139462 |