EP3034189 - System and method for expanding a tubular element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [2016/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kriesels, Petrus Cornelis Kessler Park 1 2288 GS Rijswijk / NL | 02 /
Sashidhar, Dhivya Kessler Park 1 2288 GS Rijswijk / NL | 03 /
Hartman, Stefan Aernout Kessler Park 1 2288 GS Rijswijk / NL | [2016/25] | Representative(s) | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [2016/25] | Application number, filing date | 14199067.1 | 18.12.2014 | [2016/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3034189 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B21C37/083, E21B43/10, E21B19/24, E21B17/10 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
E21B43/103 (EP);
B21C37/083 (EP);
B21C47/247 (EP);
B21C49/00 (EP);
E21B17/1085 (EP);
E21B19/24 (EP);
E21B43/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anordnung und Verfahren zur Erweiterung eines röhrenförmigen Elements | [2016/25] | English: | System and method for expanding a tubular element | [2016/25] | French: | Ensemble et procédé pour élargir un élément tubulaire | [2016/25] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/30] | 13.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO2008006841 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [YD] 1-12 * figures 1,4,5 *; | [Y]GB639860 (SAM FLOYD KEENER) [Y] 1-12 * page 1, line 81 - page 2, line 22; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5880428 (MARLIER GERY [FR], et al) [Y] 3,11 * column 3, line 19 - line 40 *; | [A]GB762326 (SHARON TUBE COMPANY) [A] 1-12 * page 1, line 20 - line 39; figure 2 * * page 4, line 100 - page 5, line 11 * | by applicant | WO2008006841 | WO2009074643 | US4637479 | US5265682 | WO2014177505 | WO2014154577 |