EP3037725 - Mixer for admixing a dilution air to the hot gas flow [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ansaldo Energia Switzerland AG Römerstrasse 36 5401 Baden / CH | [2018/44] |
Former [2017/22] | For all designated states Ansaldo Energia Switzerland AG Römerstrasse 36 5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2016/33] | For all designated states General Electric Technology GmbH Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2016/26] | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tonon, Devis Landstrasse 22 5300 Turgi / CH | 02 /
Bothien, Mirko Ruben Nuerenbergstrasse 20 8037 Zürich / CH | 03 /
Tay Wo Chong Hilares, Luis Kappelstrasse 4 5432 Neuenhof / CH | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Bernotti, Andrea, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2016/26] | Application number, filing date | 14199762.7 | 22.12.2014 | [2016/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3037725 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3037725 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/04, F23M20/00 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
F23R3/045 (EP,US);
F23R3/02 (CN);
F02C7/18 (US);
F02C3/20 (US);
F23C9/08 (US);
F23D14/64 (CN);
F23M20/005 (EP,US);
F23R3/06 (US);
F23R2900/00014 (EP,US);
F23R2900/03341 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] |
Former [2016/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Mischer zur Vermischung einer Verdünnungsluft mit einem Heißgasstrom | [2016/26] | English: | Mixer for admixing a dilution air to the hot gas flow | [2016/26] | French: | Mélangeur destiné à mélanger de l'air de dilution à l'écoulement de gaz chaud | [2016/26] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2014 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 05.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2014 | AL | 31.10.2018 | AT | 31.10.2018 | CY | 31.10.2018 | CZ | 31.10.2018 | DK | 31.10.2018 | EE | 31.10.2018 | ES | 31.10.2018 | FI | 31.10.2018 | HR | 31.10.2018 | IT | 31.10.2018 | LT | 31.10.2018 | LV | 31.10.2018 | MC | 31.10.2018 | MK | 31.10.2018 | NL | 31.10.2018 | PL | 31.10.2018 | RO | 31.10.2018 | RS | 31.10.2018 | SE | 31.10.2018 | SI | 31.10.2018 | SK | 31.10.2018 | SM | 31.10.2018 | TR | 31.10.2018 | IE | 22.12.2018 | LU | 22.12.2018 | MT | 22.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | FR | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | BG | 31.01.2019 | NO | 31.01.2019 | GR | 01.02.2019 | IS | 28.02.2019 | PT | 01.03.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IE | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 22.12.2018 | ||
MT | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
IE | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 22.12.2018 | ||
MT | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
IE | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
IE | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
IE | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 22.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
IE | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 22.12.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.12.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.12.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 31.10.2018 | |
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 31.10.2018 | |
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 31.10.2018 | |
NO | 31.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2017827 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1 * page 2, line 10 - line 66; figure 1 *; | [X]JPS5913829 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-5,8,9,11,15 * abstract *; | [A]US4833881 (VDOVIAK JOHN W [US], et al) [A] 1* column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 13; figure 5 *; | [X]US6711900 (PATEL BHAWAN BHAI [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9,11,13,15 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 15; figures 1, 2a, 11, 12 *; | [X]US2006059913 (BETHKE SVEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-9,11,15-18 * paragraphs [0009] , [0011] , [ 0014] , [ 0022] , [ 0023]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP2224170 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 1,9-14,16 * paragraph [0026] - paragraphs [0030] , [ 0042]; figures 2, 4, 7 *; | [XY]EP2549186 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-8,15 * paragraphs [0017] , [ 0021] , [ 0022] , [ 0023]; figures 1, 7, 8 * [Y] 9-14,16; | [X]WO2014029512 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [X] 1-11,15-18 * page 9, line 26 - page 10, line 3 * * page 16, line 15 - line 28; figure 5 *; | [Y]WO2014173578 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [Y] 9-14,16 * page 12, line 12 - page 14, line 10 * * page 16, line 6 - line 10; figures 1-5 * | Examination | US2014109591 | by applicant | EP0321809 | EP0704657 | DE10312971 | US2005166596 | US2011220433 | WO2014063835 |