12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
05.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
20.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
28.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
21.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
07.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
30.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
19.05.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] |
14.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
07.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] |
24.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
10.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
03.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
27.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
10.06.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
01.06.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
01.06.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.06.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.02.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.01.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
29.01.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
25.12.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.01.2016 [2016/04] |
25.12.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 27.01.2016 [2016/04] |
21.07.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
24.12.2014 |
Change - representative |
|