EP3037365 - Container having a tab and corresponding sheet material and tab [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/26] | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EMMETT, Robert Rue des Poudrières 97 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Vleck, Jan Montagu Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/26] | Vleck, Jan Montagu Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 14200100.7 | 23.12.2014 | [2016/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3037365 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/10 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
B65D85/1027 (EP);
B65D75/5838 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Behälter mit Lasche und entsprechendes Bogenmaterial und Lasche | [2016/26] | English: | Container having a tab and corresponding sheet material and tab | [2016/26] | French: | Récipient pourvu d'une languette et materiaux correspondantes et languette correspondante | [2016/26] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/25] | 06.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3093292 (AHLBOR VALTER A) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO2004108563 (PRATIS PALAZZO GIANCARLO [IT]) [X] 15 * figure 3 * [Y] 1-14; | [A]US5301804 (FOCKE HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2012095135 (FOCKE & CO [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0944539 | DE10208026 | WO2011076405 |