EP2896912 - Aircraft cooling system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/30] | Adaptive trans-critical carbon dioxide cooling systems | ||
[2023/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce Corporation 450 South Meridian Street Indianapolis, Indiana 46225-1103 / US | For all designated states Rolls-Royce North American Technologies, Inc. 2059 South Tibbs Avenue Indianapolis, IN 46241 / US | [2023/15] |
Former [2015/30] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce Corporation 450 South Meridian Street Indianapolis, Indiana 46225-1103 / US | ||
For all designated states Rolls-Royce North American Technologies, Inc. 2059 S. Tibbs Avenue Indianapolis, IN 46241 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vaisman, Igor 13931 Amblewind Place Carmel, IN Indiana 46074 / US | 02 /
Sweeney, Patrick 10714 Andrea Court Indianapolis, IN Indiana 46231 / US | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/25] |
Former [2015/30] | HGF Limited Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 14200448.0 | 29.12.2014 | [2015/30] | Priority number, date | US201314143812 | 30.12.2013 Original published format: US201314143812 | [2015/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2896912 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2896912 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F25B1/10, F25B9/00, F25B9/06, F25B49/02, // F25B40/00 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
F25B1/10 (EP,US);
F25B41/39 (EP);
F25B49/02 (EP);
F25B9/008 (EP);
F25B9/06 (EP);
F25B2309/061 (EP);
F25B2400/04 (EP);
F25B2400/072 (EP);
F25B2400/14 (EP);
F25B2400/16 (EP);
F25B2600/2523 (EP);
F25B2700/1931 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2015/30] | F25B1/10, F25B9/00, F25B9/06, F25B49/02, // F25B40/00, F25B41/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] |
Former [2015/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Flugzeugkühlsystem | [2023/14] | English: | Aircraft cooling system | [2023/14] | French: | Système de refroidissement d'avion | [2023/14] |
Former [2015/30] | Adaptive transkritische Kohlendioxidkühlanlagen | ||
Former [2015/30] | Adaptive trans-critical carbon dioxide cooling systems | ||
Former [2015/30] | Systèmes de refroidissement de dioxyde de carbone trans-critical adaptatif | Examination procedure | 22.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 19.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2021 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 08.06.2021 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 02.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/22] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 22.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.12.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2023 | CZ | 21.06.2023 | DK | 21.06.2023 | EE | 21.06.2023 | ES | 21.06.2023 | FI | 21.06.2023 | HR | 21.06.2023 | IT | 21.06.2023 | LT | 21.06.2023 | LV | 21.06.2023 | MC | 21.06.2023 | NL | 21.06.2023 | PL | 21.06.2023 | RO | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SE | 21.06.2023 | SI | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | NO | 21.09.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | PT | 23.10.2023 | LU | 29.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
IT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JP2000266415 (BOSCH AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS CORP); | [X]JP2007255889 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [XAYI]EP2244037 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]); | [XAYI]WO2013146870 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) |