EP3040401 - AN OXYGENATE TO OLEFINS CONVERSION REACTOR SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [2016/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANBORN, Richard Addison Westhollow Technology Center 3333 Hwy 6 South Houston, TX 77082-3101 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Ye-Mon Westhollow Technology Center 3333 Hwy 6 South Houston, TX 77082-3101 / US | 03 /
SADASIVAN VIJAYAKUMARI, Sivakumar LA Hwy 44 & 70 Convent, LA 70723 / US | 04 /
CHEWTER, Leslie Andrew Grasweg 31 1031 HW Amsterdam / NL | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [2016/27] | Application number, filing date | 14200577.6 | 30.12.2014 | [2016/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3040401 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C10G11/18, B01J8/18 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
C10G11/18 (EP);
B01J8/1827 (EP);
B01J8/1845 (EP);
B01J8/1872 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REAKTORSYSTEM ZUR UMWANDLUNG SAUERSTOFFHALTIGER VERBINDUNGEN ZU OLEFINEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2016/27] | English: | AN OXYGENATE TO OLEFINS CONVERSION REACTOR SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR USE THEREOF | [2016/27] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉACTEUR POUR LA CONVERSION DE COMPOSÉS OXYGÉNÉS EN OLÉFINES | [2016/27] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2015 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 10.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/29] | 15.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004024276 (SMITH JEFFREY S [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0199]; figures 3A,4,5A; examples 3C,4B,5C; claim 1 * [I] 2,3; | [X]EP0490453 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 1-4 * column 5, line 26 - line 52; figure 1; claim 9 *; | [I]US2005137439 (SMITH JEFFREY S [US]) [I] 1-4 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0028] - [0036] - [0114]; figure 1; claim 1 * | by applicant | US2011112344 | US6166282 |