EP2945073 - Method and apparatus for providing recommended information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baidu Online Network Technology Beijing Co., Ltd. Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2015/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tang, Chi c/o Baidu Online Network Technology (Beijing) Co., Ltd. Baidu Campus, No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street, Haidian District 100085 BEIJING / CN | 02 /
Li, Huadong c/o Baidu Online Network Technology (Beijing) Co., Ltd. Baidu Campus, No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street, Haidian District 100085 BEIJING / CN | 03 /
Chen, Weiyu c/o Baidu Online Network Technology (Beijing) Co., Ltd. Baidu Campus, No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street, Haidian District 100085 BEIJING / CN | 04 /
Chen, Jiajia c/o Baidu Online Network Technology (Beijing) Co., Ltd. Baidu Campus, No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street, Haidian District 100085 BEIJING / CN | 05 /
Cai, Xunliang c/o Baidu Online Network Technology (Beijing) Co., Ltd. Baidu Campus, No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street, Haidian District 100085 BEIJING / CN | 06 /
Song, Yang c/o Baidu Online Network Technology (Beijing) Co., Ltd. Baidu Campus, No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street, Haidian District 100085 BEIJING / CN | [2015/47] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/47] | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14200684.0 | 30.12.2014 | [2015/47] | Priority number, date | CN201410148403 | 14.04.2014 Original published format: CN201410148403 | [2015/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2945073 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2945073 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2015/47] | CPC: |
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
G06F16/972 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] |
Former [2015/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bereitstellung empfohlener Informationen | [2015/47] | English: | Method and apparatus for providing recommended information | [2015/47] | French: | Procédé et appareil permettant de fournir des informations recommandées | [2015/47] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 18.11.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.11.2019 | 27.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/16] | 08.12.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US8478662 (SNODGRASS RYAN J [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 2 - column 3 * * column 17, line 1 - line 65; figure 5 * * column 19, line 6 - column 20, line 16; figure 7 * |