EP2946908 - Mill-style blow molding wheel mechanism and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WestRock MWV, LLC 504 Thrasher Street Norcross GA 30071 / US | [2017/02] |
Former [2015/48] | For all designated states MeadWestvaco Corporation 501 South 5th Street Richmond, VA 23219-0501 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wade, Michael P. 7807 Duntrune Drive Chesterfield, VA 23832 / US | 02 /
Calvert, Barry G. 200 Cliffside Drive Covington, VA 24426 / US | [2015/48] | Representative(s) | Rule, John Eric, et al Coulson & Rule 13 Whitehall Road Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 3AE / GB | [2015/48] | Application number, filing date | 14200724.4 | 31.12.2014 | [2015/48] | Priority number, date | US201462000261P | 19.05.2014 Original published format: US 201462000261 P | [2015/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2946908 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/36, B29C49/04, B29C49/24, B29C49/20 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
B29C49/36 (EP,US);
B29C33/12 (EP,US);
B29C33/22 (EP,US);
B29C33/36 (EP,US);
B31B50/59 (EP,US);
B29C2049/2017 (EP,US);
B29C2049/2069 (EP,US);
B29C2049/2073 (EP,US);
B29C2049/702 (EP,US);
B29C2049/709 (EP);
B29C49/04 (EP,US);
B29C49/20 (EP,US);
B29C49/22 (EP,US);
B29C49/251 (EP,US);
B29C49/48185 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fräserartiger Blasformradmechanismus und Verfahren zur Herstellung davon | [2015/48] | English: | Mill-style blow molding wheel mechanism and method of manufacturing the same | [2015/48] | French: | Mécanisme de roue de moulage par soufflage de type moulin et son procédé de fabrication | [2015/48] | Examination procedure | 31.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/48] | 25.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/21] | 09.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3785761 (LOGOMASINI J, et al) [X] 1,6-8,10,11 * column 3, line 4 - line 10; figures 1,3 * [Y] 12-20; | [XY]US4213750 (KUBOTA KIKUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9-11 * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 5 * * column 9, line 10 - line 33; figure 2 *[Y] 4,8,12-20; | [XY]US4549865 (MYERS ROBERT A [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8,10,11 * column 1, line 10 - line 18 * * column 1, line 53 - line 57 * * column 3, line 31 - line 41 * * column 3, line 59 - line 60; figures 1,2 * [Y] 12-20; | [XY]EP0423405 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7,9-11 * column 5, line 80 - column 6, line 28; figure 1 * [Y] 4,8,12-20; | [XY]US5169470 (GOLDBERG BARRY A [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-12,15-20 * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 7; figures 1, 6-9, 16, 17 * [Y] 13,14; | [XY]US5645870 (LARSEN W BRUCE [US]) [X] 1,6-8,10,11 * column 1, line 14 - line 39 * * column 2, line 63 - line 67; figures 1, 7, 8 * [Y] 12-20 |