EP2800338 - Access control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vodafone IP Licensing Limited The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hardy, Graeme c/o Group Legal (Patents) Vodafone Group Services Limited One Kingdom Street London, W2 6BY / GB | 02 /
Bird, Andrew c/o Group Legal (Patents) Vodafone Group Services Limited One Kingdom Street London, W2 6BY / GB | 03 /
Vizor, Matthew c/o Group Legal (Patents) Vodafone Group Services Limited One Kingdom Street London, W2 6BY / GB | 04 /
Wakeman, Matthew c/o Group Legal (Patents) Vodafone Group Services Limited One Kingdom Street London, W2 6BY / GB | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 14275099.1 | 02.05.2014 | [2014/45] | Priority number, date | GB20130007995 | 03.05.2013 Original published format: GB 201307995 | [2014/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2800338 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04W12/06, H04W88/08 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
H04W12/08 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (GB);
H04L63/083 (GB);
H04L63/18 (EP,US);
H04W12/068 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] |
Former [2014/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zugangskontrolle | [2014/45] | English: | Access control | [2014/45] | French: | Contrôle d'accès | [2014/45] | Examination procedure | 01.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 07.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/19] | 04.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 19.08.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 19.08.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.01.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1320236 (MARKPORT LTD [IE]) [X] 1-7,9 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] * [Y] 8,10,12-15; | [A]US7752329 (MEENAN PATRICK [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3 - column 9; figure 1 * * columns 11,12 * | [XY] - Anonymous, "MyHotspot - Hotspot Software", (20130305), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20130305084732/http://www.mypublicwifi.com/myhotspot/en/index.html, (20140909), XP055139151 [X] 1-7,9 * pages 1,2,4,5 * [Y] 8,10,12-15 | [XY] - "AP-5131 Access Point Product Reference Guide", (20061130), pages 1 - 294, URL: http://www.etiscan.de/fileadmin/user_upload/Downloads/Handbuecher/Handbuch_M_AP5131_Product_Reference_Guide_englisch.pdf, (20140910), XP055139220 [X] 11 * page 1-1 - page 1-4 * * page 3-1 - page 3-14 * * page 4-6 * * page 5-40 - page 5-44 * * page 6-1 - page 6-8 * [Y] 8,10,12-15 |