EP2942283 - Liquid storage system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE Systems PLC 6 Carlton Gardens London SW1Y 5AD / GB | [2015/46] | Representative(s) | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department Warwick House P.O. Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/46] | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | Application number, filing date | 14275107.2 | 07.05.2014 | [2015/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2942283 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B64D37/06, B64D37/32, B60K15/03 | [2015/46] | CPC: |
B64D37/32 (EP);
B60K15/03 (EP);
F41H5/04 (EP);
B60K2015/03407 (EP);
B60Y2200/51 (EP);
B64D2037/325 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsspeichersystem | [2015/46] | English: | Liquid storage system | [2015/46] | French: | Système de stockage de liquide | [2015/46] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2016/15] | 04.12.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2155873 (BRITISH AEROSPACE) [X] 1,3,4,6-10,12,15 * the whole document * [I] 11,13,14; | [XI]GB2198099 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 1-3,5-10,12,15 * page 1, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 2; figures 1-3 * [I] 4; | [X]US4469295 (SCHUSTER IRVING [US]) [X] 1-4,7,10-14 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 32; figures 1,3 *; | [X]US6220287 (WOLF LANCE ALAN [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,10,12 * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 20; figures 1-4 *; | [X]GB2088806 (HEADRICK RICHARD T) [X] 1,6,8-13,15 * page 2, line 108 - page 3, line 46; figures 1-8 * * page 3, line 128 - page 4, line 15 *; | [A]EP1147934 (CIE PLASTIC OMNIUM BR SA [FR]) [A] 1-4,7,10,12 * paragraphs [0001] - [0018]; figures 1,7,8 * |