EP2903288 - Method and apparatus for constructing an epitome from an image [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2016/12] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
For all designated states INRIA - Institut National de Recherche en Informatique et en Automatique Domaine de Voluceau Rocquencourt 78150 Le Chesnay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alain, Martin c/o Technicolor R&D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 02 /
Thoreau, Dominique c/o Technicolor R&D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 03 /
Guillotel, Philippe c/o Technicolor R&D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 04 /
Guillemot, Christine c/o INRIA - Institut National de Recherche en Informatique et en Automatique Campus Universitaire de Beaulieu 35042 Rennes / FR | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne, et al InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 20, rue Rouget de Lisle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | Huchet, Anne Technicolor 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 14305132.4 | 30.01.2014 | [2015/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2903288 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/91, H04N19/593, // H04N19/147 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
H04N19/593 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (US);
H04N19/89 (US);
H04N19/99 (EP,US);
H04N19/147 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] |
Former [2015/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines Epitoms eines Bildes | [2015/32] | English: | Method and apparatus for constructing an epitome from an image | [2015/32] | French: | Procédé et appareil permettant de construire un épitome à partir d'une image | [2015/32] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 11.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/21] | 18.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012097882 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP2666291 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]) [AD] 1-8* the whole document *; | [X] - SUZUKI C ET AL, "Image coding by using structure / texture decomposition and an analysis of their relationship", 2010 IEEE WORKSHOP ON SIGNAL PROCESSING SYSTEM (SIPS 2010) : SAN FRANCISCO, CALIFORNIA, USA, 6 - 8 OCTOBER 2010, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20101006), ISBN 978-1-4244-8932-9, pages 105 - 110, XP031792389 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * | [XA] - SAFA CHERIGUI ET AL, "Epitome-based image compression using translational sub-pel mapping", MULTIMEDIA SIGNAL PROCESSING (MMSP), 2011 IEEE 13TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, (20111017), doi:10.1109/MMSP.2011.6093786, ISBN 978-1-4577-1432-0, pages 1 - 6, XP032027526 [X] 1,5-8 * the whole document * [A] 2-4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MMSP.2011.6093786 | [A] - WANG H ET AL, "Factoring repeated content within and among images", ACM SIGGRAPH 2008 PAPERS (SIGGRAPH '08, LOS ANGELES), NEW YORK, NY, USA, (20080811), pages 1 - 10, XP002636385 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | - HOPPE ET AL., "Factoring Repeated Content Within and Among Images", ACM SIGGRAPH 2008, (2008), vol. 27, no. 3, pages 1 - 10 | - "Factoring Repeated Content Within and Among Images", ACM SIGGRAPH 2008, (2008), vol. 27, no. 3, pages 1 - 10 | EP20110794733 |