EP2913967 - Improved traffic control in packet transport networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2015/36] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ing-Jyh, Tsang Alcatel-Lucent Bell NV Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | 02 /
De Schepper, Koen Alcatel-Lucent Bell NV Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | Whiting, Gary Venner Shipley LLP 5 Stirling House Stirling Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford GU2 7RF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/36] | D'Halleweyn, Nele Veerle Trees Gertrudis, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 14305279.3 | 27.02.2014 | [2015/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2913967 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/825 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
H04L47/265 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2015/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verbesserte Datenverkehrssteuerung in Pakettransportnetzwerken | [2015/36] | English: | Improved traffic control in packet transport networks | [2015/36] | French: | Commande améliorée de trafic dans des réseaux de transport de paquets | [2015/36] | Examination procedure | 31.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 05.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 27.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0145331 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-13,15 * page 7, line 7 - line 10 * * page 16, line 32 - page 22, line 25 * * page 27, line 16 - line 20 * * figures 1,2 * [I] 2,8; | [XAI]WO2011140395 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1,10,11,13-15 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0057] * * figure 4a * [A] 2,4-7,9,12[I] 3,8 |