EP2957559 - Iminosydnone derivatives for conjugation and release of compounds of interest [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Universite de Strasbourg 4, rue Blaise Pascal 67000 Strasbourg / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT À L'ÉNERGIE ATOMIQUE ET AUX ÉNERGIES ALTERNATIVES Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, Rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/52] | For all designated states L'Universite de Strasbourg 4, rue Blaise Pascal 67000 Strasbourg / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE ET AUX ENERGIES ALTERNATIVES Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taran, Frédéric 116, allée des Fours Blancs 91190 GIF SUR YVETTE / FR | 02 /
Wagner, Alain 25, Quai des Bateliers 67000 STRASBOURG / FR | 03 /
Kolodych, Sergii 5, rue Charles de Gaulle 91400 ORSAY / FR | 04 /
Koniev, Oleksandr 3, rue du Savon 67000 STRASBOURG / FR | [2015/52] | Representative(s) | Tezier Herman, Béatrice Cabinet Becker & Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2015/52] | Application number, filing date | 14305933.5 | 18.06.2014 | [2015/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2957559 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/54, C07D271/04, C07D495/04 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
C07D271/04 (EP,US);
C07D231/54 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
C07D495/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Iminosydnonderivate zur Konjugation und Freisetzung von Verbindungen von Interesse | [2015/52] | English: | Iminosydnone derivatives for conjugation and release of compounds of interest | [2015/52] | French: | Dérivés iminosydnones pour la conjugaison et la libération de composés d'intérêt | [2015/52] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/51] | 02.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPS4526086B [ ] (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.); | JPS4526088B [ ] (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.); | JPS4526090B [ ] (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.); | [XI] - DAENIKER; DRUEY, "Heilmittelchemische Studien In Der Heterocyclischen Reihe. 36. Mitteilung. Über Sydnonimine. II. Herstellung und Eigenschaften von Sydnoniminen mit Acyl-, Carbamoyl- und Thiocarbamoyl-Substituenten am exocyclischen Stickstoffatom", HELV. CHIM. ACTA, (19620101), vol. 45, no. 7, doi:10.1002/hlca.19620450714, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 2441 - 2462, XP055152550 [X] 7,8 * Page 2442; page 2452, table 6; page 2453, paragraph 2. * [I] 1,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19620450714 | [X] - YASHUNSKII, V. G. ET AL, "Sydnones and sydnonimines. XXVI. Reactivity of 3-aryl-sydnonimines", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1966:59381, URL: STN, XP002732477 [X] 7,8,13 * Abstract; CAS-RNs 838-38-0, 838-43-7, 838-44-8, 840-66-4, 842-85-3. * | [X] - KAMITANI, TAKASHI ET AL., "Sydnonimines", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1971:13164, URL: STN, XP002732478 [X] 7,8,13 * Abstract; CAS-RNs 30011-56-4, 30011-57-5. * | [X] - KAMITANI, TAKASHI ET AL, "Sydnonimines", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1971:13161, URL: STN, XP002732479 [X] 7,8,13 * Abstract; CAS-RN 30039-75-9. * | [X] - KAMITANI, TAKASHI ET AL, "N-Substituted-syndnonimines", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1971:13160, URL: STN, XP002732480 [X] 7,8,13 * Abstract; CAS-RNs 30039-65-7, 30039-66-8, 30039-67-9. * | [I] - BROWNE; HARRITY, "Recent developments in the chemistry of sydnones", TETRAHEDRON, vol. 66, no. 3, ISSN 0040-4020, (20100116), pages 553 - 568, (20091029), XP027534268 [I] 10-12 * Chapter 4: alkyne cycloadditions. * | [I] - WALLACE; CHIN, "Strain-promoted sydnone bicyclo-[6.1.0]-nonyne cycloaddition", CHEMICAL SCIENCE, (20140205), vol. 5, no. 5, doi:10.1039/c3sc53332h, ISSN 2041-6520, page 1742, XP055142993 [I] 10-12 * The whole document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C3SC53332H | [AD] - KOLODYCH ET AL., "Discovery of Chemoselective and Biocompatible Reactions Using a High-Throughput Immunoassay Screening", ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (20131007), vol. 52, no. 46, doi:10.1002/anie.201305645, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 12056 - 12060, XP055142984 [AD] 1 * The whole document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201305645 | [A] - VINATIER ET AL., "Esterase-activated chromane-sydnonimine prodrug hybrids", NITRIC OXIDE, vol. 15, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.NIOX.2006.03.006, ISSN 1089-8603, (20061201), pages 363 - 369, (20061201), XP024919018 [A] 1 * Abstract; page 365, figure 2; page 367, figure 7. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.niox.2006.03.006 | by applicant | - ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2013), vol. 52, pages 14112 - 14116 | - KOLODYCH ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2013), vol. 52, pages 12056 - 12060 | - J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, page 2 |