EP2958042 - Method for authenticating a user, associated system and computer program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INRIA - Institut National de Recherche en Informatique et en Automatique Domaine de Voluceau Rocquencourt 78150 Le Chesnay / FR | [2015/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Castelluccia, Claude 19 rue du Pal de Fer 38240 MEYLAN / FR | 02 /
Dürmuth, Markus Philipsstr.10 20099 HAMBURG / DE | 03 /
Imamoglu, Fatma 2311 Woolsey street, Unit B, CA BERKELEY, CA 94705 / US | 04 /
Golla, Maximilian Am Herrenacker 19 97265 HETTSTADT / DE | [2015/52] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [2015/52] | Application number, filing date | 14305941.8 | 18.06.2014 | [2015/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2958042 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/36, H04L29/06 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
G06F21/36 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (US)
|
Former IPC [2015/52] | G06F21/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] |
Former [2015/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Authentifizierung eines Benutzers, zugehöriges System und Computerprogramm | [2015/52] | English: | Method for authenticating a user, associated system and computer program | [2015/52] | French: | Procédé d'authentification d'un utilisateur, système associé et programme informatique | [2015/52] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 20.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/03] | 28.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007094717 (SRINIVASAN SUDHARSHAN [US], et al) [I] 1-17* paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0132]; figures 3, 4; claims 1-8 * | by applicant | - N OTSU, "A threshold selection method from gray-level histograms", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SYSTEMS, MAN AND CYBERNETICS, (1979), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 62 - 66 | - CORWIN J, "Perceptual identification thresholds for 150 fragmented pictures from the Snodgrass and Vanderwart picture set.Snodgrass JG1", PERCEPT MOT SKILLS, (198808), vol. 67, no. 1, pages 3 - 36 |