EP2996328 - Image processing method and apparatus, and image capturing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/11] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borel, Thierry c/o Technicolor R&D France 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 02 /
Routhier, Pierre Hugues c/o Technicolor USA Inc 2255N. Ontario Street Suite 300 Burbank, CA California 91504-3120 / US | [2016/11] | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/11] | Huchet, Anne Technicolor 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-Les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 14306401.2 | 12.09.2014 | [2016/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2996328 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/367 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
H04N25/68 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsverfahren und Bilderfassungsvorrichtung | [2016/11] | English: | Image processing method and apparatus, and image capturing device | [2016/11] | French: | Procédé et appareil de traitement d'images et dispositif de capture d'images | [2016/11] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/11] | 25.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US6965395 (NETER SARIT [US]); | [IY]EP1605403 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]); | [XY]EP1781017 (NVIDIA CORP [US]); | [IY]JP2010212788 (SHARP KK); | [Y]US2013155265 (BAE JUM-HAN [KR], et al) |