EP3016394 - Apparatus, user equipment, adaptation server, method and computer program for determining information related to a presentation time of buffered media data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2016/18] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Valentin, Stefan Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG Lorenzstrasse 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 15 17 23 80050 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14306735.3 | 30.10.2014 | [2016/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3016394 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/234, H04N21/2343, H04N21/24, H04N21/414, H04N21/61, H04N21/647 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
H04N21/2401 (EP);
H04L65/612 (EP);
H04L65/613 (EP);
H04L65/80 (EP);
H04N21/23406 (EP);
H04N21/2343 (EP);
H04N21/2402 (EP);
H04N21/414 (EP);
H04N21/6131 (EP);
H04N21/64738 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] |
Former [2016/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung, Benutzergerät, Anpassungs-Server, Verfahren und Computerprogramm zur Bestimmung von Informationen im Zusammenhang mit einer Präsentationszeit von gepufferten Mediendaten | [2016/18] | English: | Apparatus, user equipment, adaptation server, method and computer program for determining information related to a presentation time of buffered media data | [2016/18] | French: | Appareil, équipement utilisateur, serveur d'adaptation, procédé et programme informatique pour déterminer des informations relatives à un moment de présentation de données multimédias mises en tampon | [2016/18] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2014 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2016 | Examination requested [2016/50] | 14.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.10.2018 | 17.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/12] | 15.11.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010333148 (MUSHA YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0061] *; | [Y]WO2013030852 (SLING MEDIA PVT LTD [IN], et al) [Y] 6-9 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0042] *; | [XYI]US8850055 (MANI JAI JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-5,11-15 * figure 3 * * column 1, lines 35-42 * * column 3, lines 18-28 * * column 4, line 26 * * column 5, lines 9-41 * * column 6, lines 15-27 * [Y] 6-9 [I] 10; | [A] - TURNER D A ET AL, "ADAPTIVE STREAMING OF LAYER-ENCODED MULTIMEDIA PRESENTATIONS", JOURNAL OF VLSI SIGNAL PROCESSING SYSTEMS FOR SIGNAL, IMAGE, AND VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20030501), vol. 34, no. 1/02, doi:10.1023/A:1022817821444, ISSN 0922-5773, pages 83 - 99, XP001159491 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 85, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1022817821444 | by applicant | - R.P. PANTOS; W.M. MAY, "HTTP Live Streaming", INTERNET-DRAFT V13, (20140416), URL: http://tools.ietforg/html/draft-pantos-http-live-streaming- 13 | - BELL LABS AND NET MOBILE AG IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF VIDEO STREAMING IN VEHICLES ON THE MOVE, (20140617), URL: http://www.alcatel-lucent. com/press/2014/bell-labs-and-net-mobile-ag-improve-quality-video-streaming-vehicles-move |