EP3016393 - Apparatuses, content distribution server, presentation device, methods and computer programs for providing information related to a service configuration for a service provided in a network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2016/18] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Valentin, Stefan Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG Lorenzstrasse 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 15 17 23 80050 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14306737.9 | 30.10.2014 | [2016/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3016393 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/222, H04L29/06, H04N21/262, H04N21/24 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
H04N21/222 (EP);
H04L65/612 (EP);
H04L65/756 (EP);
H04L65/765 (EP);
H04N21/2401 (EP);
H04N21/2402 (EP);
H04N21/25808 (EP);
H04N21/26258 (EP);
H04N21/8456 (EP);
H04N21/85406 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] |
Former [2016/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtungen, Inhaltsverteilungsserver, Präsentationsvorrichtung, Verfahren und Computerprogramme zur Bereitstellung von Informationen bezüglich einer Dienstkonfiguration für einen in einem Netzwerk bereitgestellten Dienst | [2016/18] | English: | Apparatuses, content distribution server, presentation device, methods and computer programs for providing information related to a service configuration for a service provided in a network | [2016/18] | French: | Appareils, serveur de distribution de contenu, dispositif de présentation, procédés et programmes informatiques pour fournir des informations relatives à une configuration d'un service fourni dans un réseau | [2016/18] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2014 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2016 | Examination requested [2016/50] | 29.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.10.2018 | 18.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/12] | 15.11.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2013097309 (MA KEVIN J [US], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0011] , [0017] , [0020] , [0038] , [0046] , [0064] *; | [I]US2014040959 (OYMAN OZGUR [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0032] , [0033] * * claim 4 *; | [I]US2014149557 (LOHMAR TORSTEN [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] , [0035] , [0065] - [0067]; figure 6 * | by applicant | - R. PANTOS; W. MAY, "HTTP live streaming", IETF, INFORMATIONAL INTERNET-DRAFT 2582, (201109), URL: http://tools.ietf.org/html/draft-pantos-http-live-streaming-07 | - "Dynamic adaptive streaming over HTTP (DASH", ISO/IEC, INTERNATIONAL STANDARD DIS 23009-1.2, (2012), URL: http://standards.iso.org/ittf/PubliclyAvailableStandards/c057623 ISO IEC 23009-1 2012.zip | - R. FIELDING; J. GETTYS; J. MOGUL; H. FRYSTYK; L. MASINTER; P. LEACH; T. BERNERS-LEE, RFC 2616, HYPERTEXT TRANSFER PROTOCOL - HTTP/1.1, (1999), URL: http://www.rfc.net/rfc2616.html | - T. BERNERS-LEE; R. FIELDING; L. MASINTER, RFC 3986 UNIFORM RESOURCE IDENTIFIER (URI): GENERIC SYNTAX, (2005), URL: http://tools.ietforg/html/rfc3986 | - BELL LABS AND NET MOBILE AG IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF VIDEO STREAMING IN VEHICLES ON THE MOVE, (20140617), URL: http://www.alcatel-lucent. com/press/2014/bell-labs-and-net-mobile-ag-improve-quality-video-streaming-vehicles-move |