EP3016402 - Optical circuit switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2016/18] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vincent, François 5 avenue Raymond Chanas 38053 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
Penkler, David 5 avenue Raymond Chanas 38053 Grenoble / FR | 03 /
Minster, Benoît 5 avenue Raymond Chanas 38053 Grenoble / FR | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | Cougard, Jean-Marie, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2016/18] | Application number, filing date | 14306752.8 | 31.10.2014 | [2016/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3016402 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0005 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0016 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0039 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/005 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0056 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schalter für optische Schaltung | [2016/18] | English: | Optical circuit switch | [2016/18] | French: | Interrupteur de circuit optique | [2016/18] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/17] | 09.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US7840136 (CUNNINGHAM JOHN E [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 1, line 19 - line 23 * * column 2, line 1 - line 59 * * column 3, line 63 - column 10, line 20 * * column 11, line 65 - column 22, line 10 * * figures 4B,5-7 *; | [A]US2012251042 (JULIEN MARTIN [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 1, paragraph 8 - page 2, paragraph 15 * * page 2, paragraph 38 - page 3, paragraph 48 * * figures 1-9 *; | [A]US2013287397 (FRANKEL MICHAEL Y [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 18 - page 4, paragraph 32 * * page 5, paragraphs 45, 49 * * figures 4,5 *; | [A]US2014003760 (BERNASCONI PIETRO [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 8 - page 4, paragraph 48 * * figures 1-5,7 *; | [A]WO2009113977 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 15 * * page 5, line 3 - page 9, line 23 * * figures 1,2A * |