EP3032468 - Method for manufacturing a device including a wire interconnection pad [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEMALTO SA 6 Rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2016/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Depoutot, Frédéric Boîte Postale CS12023 c/o GEMALTO SA 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne 13881 GEMENOS Cedex / FR | 02 /
Le Loc'h, Alain Boîte Postale CS12023 c/o GEMALTO SA 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne 13881 GEMENOS Cedex / FR | 03 /
Fidalgo, Jean-Christophe Boîte Postale CS12023 c/o GEMALTO SA 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne 13881 GEMENOS Cedex / FR | 04 /
Dubois, Béatrice Boîte Postale CS12023 c/o GEMALTO SA 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne 13881 GEMENOS Cedex / FR | [2016/24] | Application number, filing date | 14307003.5 | 11.12.2014 | [2016/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3032468 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
G06K19/07754 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren einer Vorrichtung, die einen Drahtverbindungsbereich umfasst | [2016/24] | English: | Method for manufacturing a device including a wire interconnection pad | [2016/24] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un dispositif comprenant une plage d'interconnexion filaire | [2016/24] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/25] | 30.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102012211546 (MORPHO CARDS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,12 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0065] * * claim 13 * [I] 5,7-11,13; | [XI]US2013075134 (FINN DAVID [IE]) [X] 1,7,9-12 * figures 2D, 4D, 5C, 6B * * paragraphs [0063] , [0067] , [0097] , [0166] , [0168] , [0170] * [I] 2-6,8,13; | [X]EP2637129 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,12 * figures 2,7,10 * * paragraphs [0018] - [0024] *; | [A]EP2711873 (ICK CORP [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 10 * * paragraphs [0038] , [0043] - [0049] * |