EP2953248 - Method for a current mode buck-boost converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2019/29] |
Former [2016/07] | For all designated states Dialog Semiconductor (UK) Limited 100 Longwater Avenue Green Park Reading RG2 6GP / GB | ||
Former [2015/50] | For all designated states Dialog Semiconductor GmbH Neue Strasse 95 73230 Kirchheim/Teck-Nabern / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ozanoglu, Kemal Goknar Sok 26/12 Elif Apt. 34357 Istanbul / TR | 02 /
Talay, Selcuk Soyak Yenisehir, Selale Evleri, C4 34770 Istanbul / TR | 03 /
Cavallini, Pier 16 Joiner Lane Swindon, SN14BL / GB | 04 /
Graefje, Dieter Starenweg 14 73274 Notzingen / DE | 05 /
Acquas, Andrea Reutterstrasse 20 80687 Munich / DE | [2015/50] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/50] | Schuffenecker, Thierry 120 Chemin de la Maure 06800 Cagnes sur Mer / FR | Application number, filing date | 14368027.0 | 06.06.2014 | [2015/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2953248 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/158 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
H02M3/1582 (EP,US);
H02M3/158 (US);
G05F1/575 (EP,US);
H02M3/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] |
Former [2015/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren für einen Current-Mode-Abwärts-/Aufwärtswandler | [2015/50] | English: | Method for a current mode buck-boost converter | [2015/50] | French: | Procédé pour un convertisseur abaisseur-élévateur de mode de courant | [2015/50] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/19] | 22.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/15] | 08.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 22.08.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 22.08.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.09.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   19.11.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007075687 (ISHII TAKUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2009108823 (HO HSIN-HSIN [TW], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 8 * * paragraph [0039] ** figures 9,10,13 *; | [A]US2009146623 (DE CREMOUX GUILLAUME [GB], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 7 *; | [A]US2011279098 (REN HONG [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * figures 6-8 *; | [A]US2012274295 (LIN MING-WEI [TW], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0033] *; | [A]US2014084883 (TANABE HIROHISA [JP]) [A] 1-16 * figures 2a,3-5 * * paragraphs [0008] , [0014] , [0038] *; | [A] - PAUL RAJARSHI ET AL, "Smooth transition and ripple reduction in 4-switch non-inverting buck-boost power converter for WCDMA RF power amplifier", 2008 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, (20080501), doi:10.1109/ISCAS.2008.4542155, ISBN 978-1-42-441683-7, pages 3266 - 3269, XP055008505 [A] 1-16 * abstract * * chapter labelled "RIPPLE EFFECTS OF PULSE SKIPPING" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.2008.4542155 | by applicant | US6166527 | - MA, YANZHAO; JUN CHENG; GUICAN CHEN, "A high efficiency current mode step-up/step-down DC-DC converter with smooth transition", ASIC (ASICON), 2011 IEEE 9TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, (2011), pages 108 - 111 | - EHRHART, ANDREAS; BERNHARD WICHT; MORIS LIN; YUNG-SHENG HUANG; YU-HUEI LEE; KE- HORNG CHEN, ADAPTIVE PULSE SKIPPING AND ADAPTIVE COMPENSATION CAPACITANCE TECHNIQUES IN CURRENT-MODE BUCK-BOOST DC-DC CONVERTERS FOR FAST TRANSIENT RESPONSE |