EP3037235 - Device and method for melted plastic material supply to a mold cavity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ULTRASION, SL Av. Universitat Autònoma, 23 08290 Cerdanyola del Vallès Barcelona / ES | [2017/11] |
Former [2016/26] | For all designated states Fundació Privada Ascamm Av. Universitat Autònoma 23 08290 Cerdanyola del Vallès Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marfil Romero, José Antonio C/ Ignacio Iglesias, 4, 2° 5ª 08940 Cornellà de Llobregat (Barcelona) / ES | 02 /
Janer Angelet, Marcel C/ Europa 30, 3r 08014 Barcelona (Barcelona) / ES | 03 /
Plantà Torralba, Francisco Javier C/ República Argentina, 52, 1r2a 08320 EL Masnou (Barcelona) / ES | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Juncosa Miró, Jaime, et al Torner, Juncosa i Associats, S.L. C/Pau Claris, 108, 1r 1a 08009 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2016/26] | Juncosa Miro, Jaime, et al Torner, Juncosa i Associates, S.L. Gran Via de les Corts Catalanes, 669 bis, 1º, 2ª 08013 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 14380040.7 | 23.12.2014 | [2016/26] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3037235 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3037235 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B29B13/02, B29C31/04, B29C35/02, B29C45/58, B29C45/02 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
B29C31/041 (EP,CN,US);
B29B13/022 (EP,CN,US);
B29C35/0261 (EP,CN,US);
B29C45/021 (EP,CN,US);
B29C45/585 (EP,CN,US);
G05D19/02 (US);
G05D23/1927 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] |
Former [2016/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren für geschmolzene Kunststoffmaterialzufuhr zu einem Formhohlraum | [2016/26] | English: | Device and method for melted plastic material supply to a mold cavity | [2016/26] | French: | Dispositif et procédé d'alimentation en matériau plastique fondu dans une cavité de moule | [2016/26] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2014 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 19.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2014 | AL | 27.09.2017 | CY | 27.09.2017 | CZ | 27.09.2017 | EE | 27.09.2017 | GR | 27.09.2017 | HR | 27.09.2017 | LT | 27.09.2017 | LV | 27.09.2017 | MC | 27.09.2017 | MK | 27.09.2017 | PT | 27.09.2017 | RO | 27.09.2017 | RS | 27.09.2017 | SI | 27.09.2017 | SK | 27.09.2017 | SM | 27.09.2017 | TR | 27.09.2017 | MT | 23.12.2017 | BG | 27.12.2017 | NO | 27.12.2017 | IS | 27.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 23.12.2014 | |
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
GR | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MK | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 23.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 23.12.2014 | |
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MK | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 23.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 23.12.2014 | |
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MK | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 23.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 23.12.2014 | |
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MK | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 23.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 23.12.2014 | |
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 23.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.12.2014 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 23.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 23.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 23.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 23.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | HR | 27.09.2017 | |
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | HR | 27.09.2017 | |
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 27.09.2017 | |
NO | 27.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP2189264 (FUNDACIO PRIVADA ASCAMM [ES]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0043] * * figure - *; | [A]US7959054 (KONIECZKA MIKE [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 10 - line 67 * * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 16 * * figure - *; | [A]JPH09254219 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure - * | by applicant | EP2189264 | WO2004024415 | EP2591901 | EP1000732 |