01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
08.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
17.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
11.10.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
23.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
26.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
12.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
17.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
12.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
02.11.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
31.10.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
31.10.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
29.10.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
08.07.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.07.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
06.07.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
27.06.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
12.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.03.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.02.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
23.02.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
14.02.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.02.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.02.2018 |
First examination report |
|
15.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.05.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
13.05.2016 |
Change - designated states |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
07.05.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] |