EP2863113 - Luminaire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Simon, S.A.U. Diputación 390-392 08013 Barcelona / ES | [2015/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plaja Miro, Salvi C/.Lepant nº 323, 5º 2ª 08025 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
Riqué Rebull, Adrià Av. Monaco nº 37C, 4º 1º 08917 Badalona / ES | 03 /
Jordana Casamitjana, Francesc C/.La Mar Tirrena nº 3, 2º 3ª 08912 Badalona / ES | 04 /
Dapena Dominguez, Jorge C/.Escoles nº 34 08394 Sant Vicenç de Montalt / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | 01 /
Plaja Miro, Salvi C/.Lepant nº 323, 5º 2ª 08025 BARCELONA / ES | ||
02 /
Riqué Rebull, Adrià Av. Monaco nº 37C, 4º 1º 08917 BADALONA / ES | |||
03 /
Jordana Casamitjana, Francesc C/.La Mar Tirrena nº 3, 2º 3ª 08912 BADALONA / ES | |||
04 /
Dapena Dominguez, Jorge C/.Escoles nº 34 08394 SANT VICENÇ DE MONTALT / ES | Representative(s) | Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 93 5ª planta 28046 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | Espiell Volart, Eduardo Maria R. Volart Pons y Cia. S.L. Pau Claris, 77, 2.o, 1.a 08010 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 14382409.2 | 21.10.2014 | [2015/17] | Priority number, date | ES20130031545 | 21.10.2013 Original published format: ES 201331545 | [2015/17] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2863113 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F21V7/00, // F21Y115/10, F21Y105/10 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
F21V7/0083 (EP,CN,US);
F21V7/00 (ES);
F21Y2101/00 (CN);
F21Y2105/10 (EP,CN,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/17] | F21V7/00, // F21Y101/02, F21Y105/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Leuchte | [2015/17] | English: | Luminaire | [2015/17] | French: | Luminaire | [2015/17] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 16.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.12.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.12.2019 | 10.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | 12.03.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012287624 (HARBERS GERARD [US]) [X] 1-3,8 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0052] * * figures 6,7 * [I] 4,7; | [XI]US2003053310 (SOMMERS MATTHEW [US]) [X] 1-3,56 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031] * * figures 1,2 * [I] 4,7; | [A]US2012147589 (FARMER TODD [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0071] * * figures 7,9 * |