01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
09.10.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
02.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] |
28.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] |
14.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
08.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
17.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
01.11.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.10.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.10.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
30.07.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.07.2019 |
Change - German title |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
19.07.2019 |
Change - English title |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
19.07.2019 |
Change - French title |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
17.06.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.03.2019 |
First examination report |
|
16.03.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.12.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.12.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.12.2016 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
09.12.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] |
09.12.2016 |
Change - designated states |
published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] |
02.12.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.06.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
13.12.2014 |
Change - representative |
|