EP2816389 - A method for producing a mirror for a Fabry-Perot interferomete [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/52] | A mirror for a Fabry-Perot interferometer, and a method for producing the same | ||
[2015/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teknologian tutkimuskeskus VTT Oy Vuorimiehentie 3 02044 VTT Finland / FI | [2016/01] |
Former [2014/52] | For all designated states Teknologian Tutkimuskeskus VTT Vuorimiehentie 3 02044 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rissanen, Anna Teknologian tutkimuskeskus VTT c/o VTT PO Box 1000 02044 Espoo / FI | 02 /
Antila, Jarkko Teknologian tutkimuskeskus VTT c/o VTT PO Box 1000 02044 Espoo / FI | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2016/12] | Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Visiokatu 1 33720 Tampere / FI | ||
Former [2014/52] | Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Hermiankatu 1 B 33720 Tampere / FI | Application number, filing date | 14397523.3 | 13.06.2014 | [2014/52] | Priority number, date | FI20130005666 | 18.06.2013 Original published format: FI 20135666 | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2816389 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2816389 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/00, G01J3/26, G02B27/14, G01D5/24, // G02B5/08, G02B27/10 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
G02B27/142 (EP,US);
G01J3/26 (EP,FI,US);
G02B26/001 (EP,FI,US);
G02B5/284 (FI);
G02B27/1013 (EP,US);
G02B27/141 (EP,US);
G02B5/0833 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/52] | G02B26/00, G01J3/26, G02B27/14, G01D5/24, // G02B5/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] |
Former [2014/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Spiegels für Fabry-Perot-Interferometer | [2015/33] | English: | A method for producing a mirror for a Fabry-Perot interferomete | [2015/33] | French: | Procédé de production d'un miroir destiné à un interféromètre de Fabry-Perot | [2015/33] |
Former [2014/52] | Spiegel für Fabry-Perot-Interferometor und Verfahren zur Herstellung davon | ||
Former [2014/52] | A mirror for a Fabry-Perot interferometer, and a method for producing the same | ||
Former [2014/52] | Miroir destiné à un interféromètre de Fabry-Perot et procédé de production de celui-ci | Examination procedure | 23.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 16.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.06.2014 | AL | 23.03.2016 | AT | 23.03.2016 | BE | 23.03.2016 | CY | 23.03.2016 | CZ | 23.03.2016 | DK | 23.03.2016 | EE | 23.03.2016 | ES | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | HR | 23.03.2016 | IT | 23.03.2016 | LT | 23.03.2016 | LV | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | MK | 23.03.2016 | NL | 23.03.2016 | PL | 23.03.2016 | RO | 23.03.2016 | RS | 23.03.2016 | SE | 23.03.2016 | SI | 23.03.2016 | SK | 23.03.2016 | SM | 23.03.2016 | TR | 23.03.2016 | IE | 13.06.2016 | LU | 13.06.2016 | BG | 23.06.2016 | NO | 23.06.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | IS | 23.07.2016 | PT | 25.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 13.06.2014 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
TR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 13.06.2016 | ||
LU | 13.06.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 13.06.2014 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 13.06.2016 | ||
LU | 13.06.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 13.06.2014 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 13.06.2016 | ||
LU | 13.06.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 13.06.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2007171530 (NAKAMURA RYOSUKE [JP]) [Y] 8,10-12 * paragraphs [0054] - [0057] - [0072] - [0091] - [0146] - [0162] - [0204]; figures 1,3,6A-6J,11; claim 17 * [A] 1-7,9; | [A]EP2120082 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0010] , [0014] - [0023] - [0028] - [0034]; figures 1-3,5,6,7,9 *; | [A]US2012188646 (SANO AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0066] - [0079]; figures 4,5,8,9 *; | [A]US2006183644 (NAKAMURA RYOSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0105] - [0119]; figures 4A-4J * | [Y] - REES D ET AL, "A stable, rugged, capacitance-stabilised piezoelectric scanned Fabry-Perot etalon", JOURNAL OF PHYSICS E. SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, IOP PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (19811101), vol. 14, no. 11, doi:10.1088/0022-3735/14/11/024, ISSN 0022-3735, pages 1320 - 1325, XP020016366 [Y] 8,10-12 * Abstract; Section 2.;; figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0022-3735/14/11/024 |