EP2910113 - Watering arm for a mobile trailer vehicle, in particular a narrow track device carrier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fiedler Maschinenbau und Technikvertrieb GmbH Dresdner Straße 76 01877 Schmölln-Putzkau / DE | [2015/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fiedler, Frank Neukircher Straße 82 01877 Schmölln-Putzkau / DE | 02 /
Heiser, Erik Johann-Gottlieb-Fichte-Straße 7 01877 Rammenau / DE | 03 /
Pallmann, Mirco Am Spreeufer 18 01877 Lömischau / DE | 04 /
Lehmann, Björn Große Töpfergasse 9 01877 Boischofswerda / DE | [2015/35] | Representative(s) | Drechsler, Gottfried Ilberg & Weißfloh Patentanwälte Prellerstraße 26 01309 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/35] | Drechsler, Gottfried Ilberg & Weissfloh Patentanwälte Prellerstrasse 26 01309 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 14401028.7 | 21.02.2014 | [2015/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2910113 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01G25/09, B60P3/30 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
A01G25/09 (EP);
B05B15/628 (EP);
B05B15/68 (EP);
B60P3/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gießarm für ein mobiles Anbaufahrzeug, insbesondere einen Schmalspurgeräteträger | [2015/35] | English: | Watering arm for a mobile trailer vehicle, in particular a narrow track device carrier | [2015/35] | French: | Bras d'irrigation pour un véhicule porteur mobile, notamment un support d'appareil à voie étroite | [2015/35] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 14.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/49] | 13.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 13.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 13.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.06.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 13.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.06.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.06.2016 | 28.02.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010175316 (KUBACAK JOHNNY LEE [US]) [Y] 1-3,6,8-12 * paragraph [0066] *; | [Y]US6206300 (ROUDEBUSH DENNIS A [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,6,8-12 * column 6, lines 59-60; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0114036 (CASOTTI ETTORE) [Y] 6 * figure 2 *; | [A]US1745972 (BECK LOUIS W) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2013134236 (UEMATSU TEPPEI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2002158147 (RAFFERTY WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]NL1026219C (BERG PIETER CORNELIS VAN DEN [NL]) [A] 1 * figure 3 *; | [A]NL1031534C (T & G TERREIN EN GROENVOORZIEN [NL]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2012160343 (PENNER ERICH [CA], et al) [A] 1 * figure 2 * | [YA] - n/a, "Niederdruck-Gießarm Typ RGA 3", (20080729), URL: http://www.leistikow-gmbh.eu/127.html?&L=1, (20140722), XP002727631 [Y] 1-3,6,8-12 * vgl Quelltext Z. 30:; page 1; figure 1 * [A] 4,5,7 | by applicant | DE3512765 | DE29506844U | DE9306732U | EP0623278 |